EP1328449 - ISOTHERMAL BAG FOR BOTTLES AND FOODSTUFFS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meli, Andrea Via del Pesce, 1 34121 Trieste / IT | [2003/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/30] | Application number, filing date | 01983780.6 | 24.10.2001 | [2003/30] | WO2001IT00539 | Priority number, date | IT2000TS00025U | 27.10.2000 Original published format: IT TS20000025 U | IT2001TS00016U | 21.08.2001 Original published format: IT TS20010016 U | [2003/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0234644 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1328449 | Date: | 23.07.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1328449 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B65D81/38 | [2003/30] | CPC: |
B65D81/3897 (EP,US);
B65D81/3888 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄRMEISOLIERENDER BEUTEL FÜR FLASCHEN UND NAHRUNGSMITTEL | [2003/30] | English: | ISOTHERMAL BAG FOR BOTTLES AND FOODSTUFFS | [2003/30] | French: | SAC POCHETTE ISOTHERME POUR BOUTEILLES ET PRODUITS ALIMENTAIRES | [2003/30] | Entry into regional phase | 15.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 15.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/30] | 29.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   16.02.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.05.2006 | BE | 24.05.2006 | CH | 24.05.2006 | CY | 24.05.2006 | FI | 24.05.2006 | LI | 24.05.2006 | NL | 24.05.2006 | TR | 24.05.2006 | DK | 24.08.2006 | SE | 24.08.2006 | GR | 25.08.2006 | IE | 24.10.2006 | LU | 24.10.2006 | PT | 24.10.2006 | MC | 31.10.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
BE | 24.05.2006 | ||
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
TR | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
GR | 25.08.2006 | ||
IE | 24.10.2006 | ||
LU | 24.10.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
BE | 24.05.2006 | ||
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
GR | 25.08.2006 | ||
IE | 24.10.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
BE | 24.05.2006 | ||
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
IE | 24.10.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
BE | 24.05.2006 | ||
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
IT | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
IE | 24.10.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
BE | 24.05.2006 | ||
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
IT | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
BE | 24.05.2006 | ||
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
BE | 24.05.2006 | ||
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 24.08.2006 | Cited in | International search | [YA]DE2342483 (LEHA HANDELSGESELLSCHAFT MBH &) [Y] 2,3 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 2, paragraphs 1,2; figure 1 * [A] 4; | [Y]US4211091 (CAMPBELL JUNE H [US]) [Y] 1-3,5,7-10 * column 1, line 57 - column 3, line 64; figures 4,5,7 *; | [Y]US4669632 (KAWASAKI TAMOTSU [JP], et al) [Y] 10 * figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0710608 (ORIA SEEFF [IL]) [Y] 1-3,5,7-10 * column 1, line 23 - line 45; figures 1,3,7 * * column 3, lines 7-21 *; | [A]EP0758613 (FRANK HELMUT DR [DE]) [A] 1,8,9 * column 1, lines 8-12 - lines 51-56 ** column 2, lines 39-41; figures 1,2 *; | [YA]NL1001720C (DEEGE BEHEER B V [NL]) [Y] 7,8 * page 2, line 8 - line 23; figure 1 * [A] 6 |