EP1332084 - OLEOPNEUMATIC ACTUATOR CYLINDER DEVICE FOR THE ALIGNMENT IN RECTILINEAR DRIVE OF STEERING OR SELF-STEERING AXLES OF VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2005 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biondi, Armando Via della Pace, 24 40010 Sala Bolognese / IT | [2003/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/32] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/32] | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Piazzale Cavedalis 6/2 33100 Udine / IT | Application number, filing date | 01983789.7 | 30.10.2001 | [2003/32] | WO2001IT00550 | Priority number, date | IT2000VR00109 | 31.10.2000 Original published format: IT VR20000109 | [2003/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0236413 | Date: | 10.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1332084 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1332084 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B62D7/14, F15B11/072 | [2003/32] | CPC: |
B62D7/148 (EP,US);
F15B11/072 (EP,US);
F15B11/123 (EP,US);
F15B2211/20523 (EP,US);
F15B2211/30525 (EP,US);
F15B2211/327 (EP,US);
F15B2211/40507 (EP,US);
F15B2211/40515 (EP,US);
F15B2211/40553 (EP,US);
F15B2211/426 (EP,US);
F15B2211/428 (EP,US);
F15B2211/45 (EP,US);
F15B2211/455 (EP,US);
F15B2211/465 (EP,US);
F15B2211/50536 (EP,US);
F15B2211/50572 (EP,US);
F15B2211/50581 (EP,US);
F15B2211/7055 (EP,US);
F15B2211/8855 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYDROPNEUMATISCHE STELLZYLINDER-EINRICHTUNG ZUM AUSRICHTEN IN DIE GERADEAUS-STELLUNG VON LENKENDEN ODER SELBST-LENKENDEN ACHSEN VON FAHRZEUGEN | [2003/32] | English: | OLEOPNEUMATIC ACTUATOR CYLINDER DEVICE FOR THE ALIGNMENT IN RECTILINEAR DRIVE OF STEERING OR SELF-STEERING AXLES OF VEHICLES | [2003/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE VERIN DE COMMANDE OLEOPNEUMATIQUE POUR L'ALIGNEMENT DANS L'ENTRAINEMENT RECTILIGNE D'ESSIEUX DIRECTEURS OU AUTODIRECTEURS DE VEHICULES | [2003/32] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/32] | 30.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 01.09.2004 | FI | 01.09.2004 | NL | 01.09.2004 | TR | 01.09.2004 | LU | 30.10.2004 | MC | 31.10.2004 | DK | 01.12.2004 | GR | 01.12.2004 | SE | 01.12.2004 | PT | 01.02.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/10] | CY | 01.09.2004 | |
FI | 01.09.2004 | ||
NL | 01.09.2004 | ||
TR | 01.09.2004 | ||
LU | 30.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
DK | 01.12.2004 | ||
GR | 01.12.2004 | ||
SE | 01.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 01.09.2004 | |
NL | 01.09.2004 | ||
TR | 01.09.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
DK | 01.12.2004 | ||
GR | 01.12.2004 | ||
SE | 01.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 01.09.2004 | |
NL | 01.09.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
DK | 01.12.2004 | ||
GR | 01.12.2004 | ||
SE | 01.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 01.09.2004 | |
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
DK | 01.12.2004 | ||
GR | 01.12.2004 | ||
SE | 01.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | FI | 01.09.2004 | |
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
GR | 01.12.2004 | ||
SE | 01.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 01.09.2004 | |
GR | 01.12.2004 | ||
SE | 01.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 01.09.2004 | |
SE | 01.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 01.12.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0786394 (R C D S R L [IT]); | [A] - WINTERHAGEN J, "NEUENTWICKLUNGEN BEI NUTZFAHRZEUGLENKUNGEN NEW DEVELOPMENTS IN STEERING SYSTEMS FOR COMMERCIAL VEHICLES", ATZ AUTOMOBILTECHNISCHE ZEITSCHRIFT, FRANCKH'SCHE VERLAGSHANDLUNG. STUTTGART, DE, (19950701), vol. 97, no. 7/8, ISSN 0001-2785, pages 428,430 - 431, XP000521273 [A] 1-6,14,15 * page 430, column M, line 5 - page 431, column L, line 8; figure 2 * | Examination | EP0477816 |