EP1325891 - GLASS BASE MATERIAL PRODUCING DEVICE AND GLASS BASE MATERIAL PRODUCING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.07.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Ohte-machi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/28] | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Oote-machi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIMADA, Tadakatsu, SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 13-1, Isobe 2-chome Annaka-shi, Gunma 379-0195 / JP | 02 /
TOBISAKA, Yuuji, SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 13-1, Isobe 2-chome Annaka-shi, Gunma 379-0195 / JP | 03 /
HATAYAMA, Kazuhisa, SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 13-1, Isobe 2-chome Annaka-shi, Gunma 379-0195 / JP | 04 /
HIRASAWA, Hideo, SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 13-1, Isobe 2-chome Annaka-shi, Gunma 379-0195 / JP | [2003/28] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/28] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner Mozartstrasse 17 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01984412.5 | 18.07.2001 | [2003/28] | WO2001JP06271 | Priority number, date | JP20000230508 | 31.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000230508 | JP20000234108 | 02.08.2000 Original published format: JP 2000234108 | JP20000238502 | 07.08.2000 Original published format: JP 2000238502 | [2003/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0210079 | Date: | 07.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1325891 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.02.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C03B8/04, C03B37/018, C03B35/26, C03B37/012, C03B37/014 | [2005/28] | CPC: |
C03B37/0142 (EP,US);
C03B37/018 (KR);
C03B37/01202 (EP,US);
C03B37/01406 (EP,US);
C03B37/01486 (EP,US);
C03B2207/36 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2003/28] | C03B8/04, C03B37/018, C03B35/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/20] |
Former [2003/28] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON AUF GLAS BASIERENDEN MATERIALIEN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN VON AUF GLAS BASIERENDEN MATERIALIEN | [2003/28] | English: | GLASS BASE MATERIAL PRODUCING DEVICE AND GLASS BASE MATERIAL PRODUCING METHOD | [2003/28] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UNE MATIERE A BASE DE VERRE | [2003/28] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2003 | Translation filed | 29.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2003 | Search fee paid | 29.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 29.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/28] | 04.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/32] | 04.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.04.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2000169174 ; | [A]JPH10310441 ; | [A]JPH03228845 ; | [XY]WO9933755 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) [X] 1-9,34,35 * the whole document * [Y] 11-20; | [A]EP0976690 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1,34 * paragraph [0062] - paragraphs [0067] , [0071]; figures 1,2 *; | [PXY]EP1044931 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [PX] 1-9,34,35 * paragraphs [0013] , [0017] , [0018] , [0032] - paragraph [0034]; figures 1-4,6; claim 5 * [PY] 11-20; | [PA]EP1065175 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [PA] 1,34 * paragraphs [0010] - [0015] - [0018] - paragraphs [0022] , [0065]; figures 1-3a * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001013), vol. 2000, no. 09, & JP2000169174 A 20000620 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC IND LTD) [Y] 11-20 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990226), vol. 1999, no. 02, & JP10310441 A 19981124 (SHINETSU ENG KK) [A] 21 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920107), vol. 016, no. 001, Database accession no. (C - 0899), & JP03228845 A 19911009 (SHIN ETSU CHEM CO LTD) [A] 1,34 * abstract * | International search | [X]JPH03279234 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO); | [A]EP0476218 (CORNING INC [US]); | [A]JP2000044276 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO) |