EP1306363 - ADAMANTYL ESTER MONOMER COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.03.2006 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tokuyama Corporation 1-1, Mikage-cho Tokuyama-shi, Yamaguchi-ken 745-0053 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/18] | For all designated states TOKUYAMA CORPORATION 1-1, Mikage-cho Tokuyama-shi, Yamaguchi-ken 745-0053 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAMOTO, Hiromasa, Tokuyama Corporation 1-1, Mikage-cho Tokuyama-shi, Yamaguchi 745-0053 / JP | 02 /
YAMAGUCHI, Masao, Tokuyama Corporation 1-1, Mikage-cho Tokuyama-shi, Yamaguchi 745-0053 / JP | 03 /
HIROTA, Yoshihiro, Tokuyama Corporation 1-1, Mikage-cho Tokuyama-shi, Yamaguchi 745-0053 / JP | [2003/18] | Representative(s) | Ziebig, Marlene, et al Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Wallstrasse 58/59 DE-10179 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Ziebig, Marlene, et al Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2003/18] | Ziebig, Marlene, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Schützenstrasse, 15-17 10117 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 01984487.7 | 18.07.2001 | [2003/18] | WO2001JP06207 | Priority number, date | JP20000235403 | 03.08.2000 Original published format: JP 2000235403 | [2003/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0212163 | Date: | 14.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1306363 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.02.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07C67/62, C07C67/54, C07C69/54 | [2003/18] | CPC: |
C07C67/54 (EP,US);
C07C67/62 (EP,KR,US);
C07C2603/74 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C67/54, C07C69/54 (EP,US);
C07C67/62, C07C69/54 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2004/20] |
Former [2003/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | ADAMANTYLESTER-MONOMERZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2003/18] | English: | ADAMANTYL ESTER MONOMER COMPOSITION | [2003/18] | French: | COMPOSITION MONOM RE D'ESTER D'ADAMANTYLE | [2003/18] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2003 | Translation filed | 30.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2003 | Search fee paid | 30.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 30.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/18] | 09.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/20] | 16.12.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3518241 (DULING IRL N, et al) [A] 1,4* column 5, line 4 - line 10; example 1 * | International search | [X]JPH03115385 (TOKUYAMA SODA KK); | [X]JPH03121188 (TOKUYAMA SODA KK); | [X]JPH03124790 (TOKUYAMA SODA KK) |