EP1322678 - A CATALYST SYSTEM AND ITS USE IN A POLYMERIZATION PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.06.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.07.2006 [2006/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Univation Technologies LLC Suite 1950, 5555 San Felipe Houston, TX 77056 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/27] | For all designated states Univation Technologies LLC Suite 1950, 5555 San Felipe Houston, TX 77056 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLTCAMP, Matthew, W. 26935 Carol Drive Huffman, TX 77336 / US | [2003/27] | Representative(s) | Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/27] | Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd, et al Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 01984566.8 | 29.06.2001 | [2003/27] | WO2001US20740 | Priority number, date | US20000649746 | 28.08.2000 Original published format: US 649746 | [2003/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0218452 | Date: | 07.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1322678 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C08F4/602, C07F5/06, C08F10/00 | [2003/27] | CPC: |
C08F10/00 (EP,US);
C07F5/061 (EP,US);
C07F5/062 (EP,US);
C08F210/16 (EP,US);
C08F4/659 (EP,US);
C08F4/65925 (EP,US);
Y10S526/943 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/602 (EP,US);
C08F10/00, C08F4/65912 (US,EP);
C08F210/16, C08F210/14, C08F2500/03 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KATALYSATORSYSTEM UND DESSEN VERWENDUNG IN EINEM POLYMERISATIONSVERFAHREN | [2003/27] | English: | A CATALYST SYSTEM AND ITS USE IN A POLYMERIZATION PROCESS | [2003/27] | French: | SYSTEME DE CATALYSE ET UTILISATION DE CE SYSTEME DANS UN PROCESSUS DE POLYMERISATION | [2003/27] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.03.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/27] | 05.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/29] | 01.03.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0500944 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]) [X] 1-4 * example 1 *; | [X]WO9623005 (GRACE W R & CO [US]) [X] 1-4,12-17 * examples 4-6; claims 1,8 *; | [X]WO0044793 (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP], et al) [X] 27-30; | EP1167393 [ ] (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]) [ ] * page 22 - page 23; examples I-1 *; | [X]EP0573403 (FINA TECHNOLOGY [US]) [X] 15-30 * tables I,II *; | [X]WO0020472 (GOODRICH CO B F [US], et al) [X] 15-30 * page 263, line 27 - line 28; claim 64 *; | [X]WO0044794 (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP], et al) [X] 27-30; | EP1085026 [ ] (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]) [ ] * page 22 - page 23; example 1 *; | [PX]WO0050469 (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP], et al) [PX] 27-30; | EP1167394 [ ] (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]) [ ] * page 21 - page 22; examples 1,2 *; | [X]US3901868 (UENO HARUO, et al) [X] 27-30 * column 10; example 34; table 2 *; | [X]EP0774470 (ATOCHEM ELF SA [FR]) [X] 27-30 * column 9 - column 11; examples 1,2; claim 1 *; | [X]WO9915534 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US], et al) [X] 5-7,19,21 * page 20 - page 27; examples 1-8 *; | [X]WO9918135 (TARGOR GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 18,20 * page 29 - page 31; examples 1-4 *; | [DX]WO9906414 (TARGOR GMBH [DE], et al) [DX] 18,20 * page 29 - page 32; examples 1-8 *; | [A]WO9807515 (UNIV NORTHWESTERN [US]) | [DX] - BOCHMANN ET AL, "Reaction of AlR3 with [CPh3][B(C6F5)4]: Facile Degradation of [B(C6F5)4]- by Transient [AlR2]+", ORGANOMETALLICS, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (19981221), vol. 17, no. 26, ISSN 0276-7333, pages 5908 - 5912, XP002120214 [DX] 1-4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/om980400j |