EP1315815 - NUCLEOTIDE SEQUENCES WHICH CODE FOR THE DEP34 GENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2008 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Strasse 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2007/45] | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Bennigsenplatz 1 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2007/08] | For all designated states Degussa GmbH Bennigsenplatz 1 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2003/23] | For all designated states Degussa AG Bennigsenplatz 1 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FARWICK, Mike Gustav-Adolf-Strasse 11 33615 Bielefeld / DE | 02 /
HUTHMACHER, Klaus Lärchenweg 18 63571 Gelnhausen / DE | 03 /
PFEFFERLE, Walter Jahnstrasse 33 33790 Halle (Westf.) / DE | 04 /
HERMANN, Thomas Zirkonstrasse 8 33739 Bielefeld / DE | 05 /
BATHE, Brigitte Twieten 1 33154 Salzkotten / DE | [2003/23] | Application number, filing date | 01984655.9 | 11.08.2001 | [2003/23] | WO2001EP09313 | Priority number, date | DE20001044708 | 09.09.2000 Original published format: DE 10044708 | DE20011012429 | 15.03.2001 Original published format: DE 10112429 | [2003/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0222843 | Date: | 21.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1315815 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1315815 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/31, C12N15/63, C12N1/21, C07K14/34, C12P13/08, C12Q1/68 | [2003/23] | CPC: |
C07K14/34 (EP,US);
C12P13/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NUKLEOTIDSEQUENZEN DIE FÜR DAS DEP34-GEN KODIEREN | [2003/23] | English: | NUCLEOTIDE SEQUENCES WHICH CODE FOR THE DEP34 GENE | [2003/23] | French: | SEQUENCES NUCLEOTIDIQUES CODANT POUR LE GENE DEP34 | [2003/23] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/23] | 11.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.04.2007 | BE | 18.04.2007 | CH | 18.04.2007 | CY | 18.04.2007 | DK | 18.04.2007 | FI | 18.04.2007 | FR | 18.04.2007 | IT | 18.04.2007 | LI | 18.04.2007 | NL | 18.04.2007 | TR | 18.04.2007 | SE | 18.07.2007 | GR | 19.07.2007 | ES | 29.07.2007 | GB | 11.08.2007 | LU | 11.08.2007 | IE | 13.08.2007 | MC | 31.08.2007 | PT | 18.09.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
BE | 18.04.2007 | ||
CH | 18.04.2007 | ||
CY | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
FR | 18.04.2007 | ||
IT | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
GB | 11.08.2007 | ||
LU | 11.08.2007 | ||
IE | 13.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
BE | 18.04.2007 | ||
CH | 18.04.2007 | ||
CY | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
FR | 18.04.2007 | ||
IT | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
GB | 11.08.2007 | ||
IE | 13.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/03] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
BE | 18.04.2007 | ||
CH | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
FR | 18.04.2007 | ||
IT | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
GB | 11.08.2007 | ||
IE | 13.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/52] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
BE | 18.04.2007 | ||
CH | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
FR | 18.04.2007 | ||
IT | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
IE | 13.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/45] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
BE | 18.04.2007 | ||
CH | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
IT | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
IE | 13.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
FR | 14.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
BE | 18.04.2007 | ||
CH | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
IT | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
FR | 14.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
BE | 18.04.2007 | ||
CH | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
BE | 18.04.2007 | ||
CH | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
BE | 18.04.2007 | ||
CH | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
BE | 18.04.2007 | ||
CH | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
CH | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | CH | 18.04.2007 | |
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | ES | 29.07.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0435132 (FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM JUELICH GMBH [DE]) [A] 10-16,18 * the whole document * * page 3, lines 47-49 *; | [PX]WO0100804 (BASF AG [DE]) [PX] 1-7,19,20 * Note: 100.0% nt seq identity of SEQ ID NO:247 with SEQ ID NO:1 in 1770 nt overlap (1-1770:159-1928), 100.0% aa seq identity of SEQ ID NO:248 with SEQ ID NO:2 in 549 aa overlap (1-549:1-549).; page 1, line 19 - page 8, line 32 * * page 59 *; | [PX]EP1108790 (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK [JP]) [PX] 1-7,19,20 * Note: 100.0% nt seq identity of SEQ ID NO:426 with SEQ ID NO:1 in 1647 nt overlap (1-1647:259-1905), 100.0% aa seq ident of SEQ ID NO:3926 with SEQ ID NO:2 in 549 aa overlap (1-549:1-549).; page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 13 ** page 56 *; | [A] - SEEGER K J ET AL., "Streptomyces coelicolor cosmid 9C7", EMBL, (19990112), Database accession no. AL035161, XP002197907 [A] 1 * Note: 58.5% nt seq identity with SEQ ID NO:1 in 1290 nt overlap (18806-20080:392-1669), 44.1% aa seq identity with SEQ ID NO:2 in 538 aa overlap (14-530:7-544).; page 7, line 48 - page 8, line 4 * * page 15 * | [A] - EGGELING L ET AL., "L-Glutamate and L-lysine: traditional products with impetuous developments.", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1999), vol. 52, no. 2, pages 146 - 153, XP002197906 [A] 10-16,18 * abstract * * page 147, column R, line 14 - page 148, column L, line 31; figure 3 * * page 150, column L, line 9 - page 152, column L, line 19; figure 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s002530051501 | [A] - KRÄMER R, "Genetic and physiological approaches for the production of amino acids", JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, (19960212), vol. 45, no. 1, ISSN 0168-1656, pages 1 - 21, XP004036833 [A] 10-16,18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-1656(95)00146-8 |