EP1345688 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SORPTION MATERIAL THAT CONTAINS IRON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEH Wasserchemie GmbH & Co. KG Heinrich-Hasemeier-Strasse 33 49076 Osnabrück / DE | [2003/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DRIEHAUS, Wolfgang Am Eichholz 2 49143 Bissendorf / DE | [2003/39] | Representative(s) | Scheffler, Jörg Tergau & Pohl Patentanwälte Adelheidstrasse 5 30171 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/39] | Scheffler, Jörg Tergau & Pohl, Hildesheimer Strasse 133 30173 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 01984697.1 | 12.12.2001 | [2003/39] | WO2001DE04666 | Priority number, date | DE2000161800 | 13.12.2000 Original published format: DE 10061800 | [2003/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0247811 | Date: | 20.06.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1345688 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1345688 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B01J20/06, B01J20/30, C01G49/02 | [2003/39] | CPC: |
B01J20/0229 (EP,US);
B01J20/06 (EP,US);
B01J20/30 (EP,US);
C01G49/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES EISENHALTIGEN SORPTIONSMATERIALS | [2003/39] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SORPTION MATERIAL THAT CONTAINS IRON | [2003/39] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN MATERIAU ADSORBANT A BASE DE FER | [2004/35] |
Former [2003/39] | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN MATERIAU SORBANT A BASE DE FER | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/39] | 02.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.01.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.01.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 28.12.2005 | FI | 28.12.2005 | IE | 28.12.2005 | IT | 28.12.2005 | NL | 28.12.2005 | TR | 28.12.2005 | DK | 28.03.2006 | GR | 28.03.2006 | SE | 28.03.2006 | ES | 08.04.2006 | PT | 29.05.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/38] | FI | 28.12.2005 | |
IE | 28.12.2005 | ||
IT | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
TR | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | FI | 28.12.2005 | |
IE | 28.12.2005 | ||
IT | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 28.12.2005 | |
IE | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | FI | 28.12.2005 | |
IE | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | FI | 28.12.2005 | |
IE | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | FI | 28.12.2005 | |
IE | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | FI | 28.12.2005 | |
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | FI | 28.12.2005 | |
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 28.12.2005 | |
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 28.12.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4459276 (NOBUOKA SOICHIRO [JP], et al); | [DA]DE4320003 (JEKEL MARTIN PROF DR ING [DE]); | [DA]DE19745664 (ES HA ES ANLAGENSTEUERUNGEN AU [DE]) |