EP1352362 - DATA CARRIER ARRANGEMENT WITH A DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/42] | DATA SUPPORT ARRANGEMENT WITH A DISPLAY DEVICE | ||
[2004/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 12.09.2007 [2007/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | [2003/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FREY, Volker Hasenstr. 12/1 70199 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
MÜLLER, Jochen Probstberg 83 93173 Wenzenbach / DE | 03 /
RANDLER, Martin Schwarzwaldstr. 76 70561 Stuttgart / DE | 04 /
TRIER, Bernhard Weingartenstr. 65 73447 Oberkochen / DE | [2004/42] |
Former [2003/42] | 01 /
FREY, Volker Kelterstr. 8 70199 Stuttgart / DE | ||
02 /
MÜLLER, Jochen Probstberg 83 93173 Wenzenbach / DE | |||
03 /
RANDLER, Martin Schwarzwaldstr. 76 70561 Stuttgart / DE | |||
04 /
TRIER, Bernhard Weingartenstr. 65 73447 Oberkochen / DE | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schlossschmidstrasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/42] | Epping Hermann & Fischer Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01984737.5 | 28.12.2001 | [2003/42] | WO2001DE04949 | Priority number, date | DE2000165748 | 29.12.2000 Original published format: DE 10065748 | [2003/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02054344 | Date: | 11.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1352362 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1352362 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077 | [2003/42] | CPC: |
G06K19/07703 (EP,US);
G06K19/077 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/20] |
Former [2003/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | DATENTRÄGERANORDNUNG MIT EINER ANZEIGEEINRICHTUNG | [2003/42] | English: | DATA CARRIER ARRANGEMENT WITH A DISPLAY DEVICE | [2004/20] | French: | ENSEMBLE SUPPORT DE DONNEES COMPRENANT UN DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE | [2003/42] |
Former [2003/42] | DATA SUPPORT ARRANGEMENT WITH A DISPLAY DEVICE | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/42] | 20.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 20.10.2004 | ES | 31.01.2005 | [2007/37] |
Former [2005/27] | ES | 31.01.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4918631 (HARA KAZUYA [JP], et al); | [X]EP0542524 (NCR INT INC [US]); | [Y]US5422516 (HOSOKAWA TAKASHI [JP], et al); | [X]DE19604374 (KODAK AG [DE]); | [Y]DE19631557 (KUBAN WALDEMAR [DE]); | [A]EP0845695 (LUEDER ERNST [DE]); | [X]US5818030 (REYES RENE A [US]); | [A]DE19923138 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) |