EP1348212 - MOBILE TERMINAL CONTROLLABLE BY SPOKEN UTTERANCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2006 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 12.09.2007 [2007/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 16483 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2003/40] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (Publ) 126 25 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HELLWIG, Karl Hauptstrasse 32 97539 Wonfurt / DE | 02 /
DOBLER, Stefan Tennenbachweg 2a 91077 Neunkirchen am Brand / DE | 03 /
ÖIJER, Fredrik Bankgatan 11 B S-223 52 Lund / SE | [2003/40] | Representative(s) | Tonscheidt, Andreas Ericsson GmbH Ericsson Allee 1 52134 Herzogenrath / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/40] | Tonscheidt, Andreas Ericsson Eurolab Deutschland GmbH Research Department Ericsson Allee 1 52134 Herzogenrath / DE | Application number, filing date | 01984819.1 | 10.12.2001 | [2003/40] | WO2001EP14493 | Priority number, date | EP20000127467 | 14.12.2000 Original published format: EP 00127467 | [2003/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0249005 | Date: | 20.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1348212 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1348212 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G10L15/26 | [2003/40] | CPC: |
G10L15/30 (EP,US);
G10L2015/223 (EP,US);
H04M1/271 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPRACHGESTEUERTES TRAGBARES ENDGERÄT | [2003/40] | English: | MOBILE TERMINAL CONTROLLABLE BY SPOKEN UTTERANCES | [2003/40] | French: | TERMINAL MOBILE A COMMANDE VOCALE | [2003/40] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/40] | 19.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.06.2005 | BE | 29.06.2005 | CH | 29.06.2005 | ES | 29.06.2005 | FI | 29.06.2005 | IT | 29.06.2005 | LI | 29.06.2005 | NL | 29.06.2005 | TR | 29.06.2005 | DK | 29.09.2005 | GR | 29.09.2005 | SE | 29.09.2005 | PT | 07.12.2005 | CY | 10.12.2005 | IE | 12.12.2005 | LU | 31.12.2005 | MC | 31.12.2005 | [2007/37] |
Former [2007/20] | AT | 29.06.2005 | |
BE | 29.06.2005 | ||
CH | 29.06.2005 | ||
ES | 29.06.2005 | ||
FI | 29.06.2005 | ||
LI | 29.06.2005 | ||
NL | 29.06.2005 | ||
TR | 29.06.2005 | ||
DK | 29.09.2005 | ||
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
SE | 29.09.2005 | ||
PT | 07.12.2005 | ||
CY | 10.12.2005 | ||
IE | 12.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2007/10] | AT | 29.06.2005 | |
BE | 29.06.2005 | ||
CH | 29.06.2005 | ||
ES | 29.06.2005 | ||
FI | 29.06.2005 | ||
LI | 29.06.2005 | ||
NL | 29.06.2005 | ||
TR | 29.06.2005 | ||
DK | 29.09.2005 | ||
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
SE | 29.09.2005 | ||
PT | 07.12.2005 | ||
IE | 12.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 29.06.2005 | |
BE | 29.06.2005 | ||
CH | 29.06.2005 | ||
FI | 29.06.2005 | ||
LI | 29.06.2005 | ||
NL | 29.06.2005 | ||
TR | 29.06.2005 | ||
DK | 29.09.2005 | ||
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
SE | 29.09.2005 | ||
PT | 07.12.2005 | ||
IE | 12.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 29.06.2005 | |
BE | 29.06.2005 | ||
CH | 29.06.2005 | ||
FI | 29.06.2005 | ||
LI | 29.06.2005 | ||
NL | 29.06.2005 | ||
DK | 29.09.2005 | ||
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
SE | 29.09.2005 | ||
PT | 07.12.2005 | ||
IE | 12.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/40] | AT | 29.06.2005 | |
BE | 29.06.2005 | ||
CH | 29.06.2005 | ||
FI | 29.06.2005 | ||
LI | 29.06.2005 | ||
NL | 29.06.2005 | ||
DK | 29.09.2005 | ||
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
SE | 29.09.2005 | ||
PT | 07.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 29.06.2005 | |
BE | 29.06.2005 | ||
CH | 29.06.2005 | ||
FI | 29.06.2005 | ||
LI | 29.06.2005 | ||
NL | 29.06.2005 | ||
DK | 29.09.2005 | ||
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
SE | 29.09.2005 | ||
PT | 07.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 29.06.2005 | |
BE | 29.06.2005 | ||
CH | 29.06.2005 | ||
FI | 29.06.2005 | ||
LI | 29.06.2005 | ||
NL | 29.06.2005 | ||
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
SE | 29.09.2005 | ||
PT | 07.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 29.06.2005 | |
BE | 29.06.2005 | ||
CH | 29.06.2005 | ||
FI | 29.06.2005 | ||
LI | 29.06.2005 | ||
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
SE | 29.09.2005 | ||
PT | 07.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 29.06.2005 | |
BE | 29.06.2005 | ||
FI | 29.06.2005 | ||
SE | 29.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 29.06.2005 | |
SE | 29.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 29.09.2005 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5892813 (MORIN PHILIPPE R [US], et al) [Y] 13,14,19 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 22; figures 3,4 *; | [Y]DE19751123 (DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG [DE]) [Y] 3 * column 4, line 37 - line 42 *; | [Y]EP0945851 (IBM [US]) [Y] 8,9,15,16,22 * column 3, line 56 - column 5, line 53 *; | [A]EP0953967 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,10,17,23* abstract *; | [Y]EP1047046 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 4 * column 4, line 27 - line 30; figure 1 *; | [XY]WO0065807 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7,10-12,17,18,20,21,23,24 * page 3, line 15 - line 21; figure 2 * * page 7, line 30 - page 10, line 23 * [Y] 3,4,8,9,13-16,19,22 |