EP1339840 - SCHIZOPHRENIA-RELATED VOLTAGE-GATED ION CHANNEL GENE AND PROTEIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Serono Genetics Institute S.A. Route Nationale 7 91030 Evry Cedex / FR | [2004/52] |
Former [2003/42] | For all designated states Genset Route Nationale 7 91000 Evry / FR | ||
Former [2003/36] | For all designated states GENSET 24, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COHEN, Daniel 1, boulevard Richard Wallace F-92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | 02 /
CHUMAKOV, Ilya 196, rue des Chevrefeuilles F-77000 Vaux-le-Penil / FR | 03 /
SIMON, Anne-Marie Appartement 86, 41, rue de Reuilly F-75012 Paris / FR | 04 /
ABDERRAHIM, Hadi 145, rue de Paris F-94220 Charenton le Pont / FR | [2003/36] | Representative(s) | Brasnett, Adrian Hugh, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/36] | Brasnett, Adrian Hugh, et al Mewburn Ellis York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 01984902.5 | 04.12.2001 | [2003/36] | WO2001IB02798 | Priority number, date | US20000251317P | 05.12.2000 Original published format: US 251317 P | [2003/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0246404 | Date: | 13.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1339840 | Date: | 03.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1339840 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C07K14/705, C12N15/63, A01K67/027, C07K16/28, C12Q1/68, G01N33/50 | [2003/36] | CPC: |
C07K14/705 (EP,US);
C12N15/11 (KR);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A01K2217/05 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/36] | Extension states | AL | 06.06.2003 | LT | 06.06.2003 | LV | 06.06.2003 | MK | 06.06.2003 | RO | 06.06.2003 | SI | 06.06.2003 | Title | German: | MIT SCHIZOPHRENIE IN ZUSAMMENHANG STEHENDES GEN, DAS FÜR EIN POTENTIAL-ABHÄNGIGES IONKANAL KODIERT | [2003/36] | English: | SCHIZOPHRENIA-RELATED VOLTAGE-GATED ION CHANNEL GENE AND PROTEIN | [2003/36] | French: | GENE ET PROTEINE DE CANAL IONIQUE DEPENDANT DU POTENTIEL, ASSOCIE A LA SCHIZOPHRENIE | [2003/36] | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/36] | 28.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.03.2006 | 21.02.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 17.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2006 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 25.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.09.2006 | CY | 13.09.2006 | FI | 13.09.2006 | NL | 13.09.2006 | TR | 13.09.2006 | IE | 04.12.2006 | LU | 04.12.2006 | DK | 13.12.2006 | SE | 13.12.2006 | GR | 14.12.2006 | MC | 31.12.2006 | PT | 26.02.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
TR | 13.09.2006 | ||
IE | 04.12.2006 | ||
LU | 04.12.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
GR | 14.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
IE | 04.12.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
GR | 14.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
IE | 04.12.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/45] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
IT | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/26] | FI | 13.09.2006 | |
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 13.09.2006 | |
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | FI | 13.09.2006 | |
SE | 13.12.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9928342 (SIBIA NEUROSCIENCES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9966041 (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [X] 2-23 * SEQ ID N°:46; page 72, line 8 - page 74, line 8 *; | [PX]WO0183752 (MILLENNIUM PHARM INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-23 * Human ion channel protein IC23949; SEQ ID N°:1-3;; figure 1 *; | [E]WO0204520 (INCYTE GENOMICS INC [US]) [E] 1-23 * SEQ ID N°:28,60 (TRICH28); page 90; table 2 ** page 108; table 3 *; | [XD] - LEE J H ET AL, "Cloning of a novel four repeat protein related to voltage-gated sodium and calcium channels.", FEBS LETTERS. NETHERLANDS 26 FEB 1999, (19990226), vol. 445, no. 2-3, ISSN 0014-5793, pages 231 - 236, XP002212096 [XD] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-5793(99)00082-4 | [X] - "Homo sapiens chromosome 12 clone RP11-392G11", EMBL, (20000512), Database accession no. AC068887, URL: EBI, XP002212097 [X] 1,4-8 * nt 68710-69162 * | Examination | - BRZUSTOWICZ L.M. ET AL, "Linkage of familial schizophrenia to chromosome 13q32", AM.J.HUM.GENET., (1999), vol. 65, pages 1096 - 1103 | - GOULD R.J. ET AL, "ANTISCHIZOPHRENIC DRUGS OF THE DIPHENYLBUTYLPIPERIDINE TYPE ACT AS CALCIUM CHANNEL ANTAGONISTS", PROC.NATL.ACAD.SCI.USA, (1983), vol. 80, pages 5122 - 5125, XP000867760 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.80.16.5122 | - JAY GARGUS J. ET AL, MOLECULAR MEDICINE TODAY, (199812), vol. 4, no. 12, pages 518 - 524 |