EP1344039 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING DRAWN MICROCHANNEL ARRAY DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/38] | DRAWN MICROCHANNEL ARRAY DEVICES AND METHOD OF ANALYSIS USING SAME | ||
[2005/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, FR | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Polymicro Technologies LLC 18019 N. 25th Avenue Phoenix, AZ 85023 / US | [2006/17] |
Former [2006/15] | For all designated states Polymicro Technologies, Inc. 18019 North 25th Avenue Phoenix Arizona 85023-1200 / US | ||
Former [2003/38] | For all designated states Polymicro Technologies, Inc. 18019 North 25th Avenue Phoenix, Arizona 85023-1200 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLARKIN, James P., c/o Polymicro Technologies LLC 18019 N. 25th Avenue Phoenix, AZ 85023 / US | 02 /
NELSON, Gary W., c/o Polymicro Technologies LLC 18019 N. 25th Avenue Phoenix, AZ 85023 / US | 03 /
MACOMBER, Robert J., c/o Polymicro Tech. LLC 18019 N. 25th Avenue Phoenix, AZ 85023 / US | [2003/38] | Representative(s) | Smart, Peter John Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/38] | Smart, Peter John W.H. BECK, GREENER & CO 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01985542.8 | 13.12.2001 | [2003/38] | WO2001US47947 | Priority number, date | US20000254881P | 13.12.2000 Original published format: US 254881 P | US20010771569 | 30.01.2001 Original published format: US 771569 | [2003/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0248677 | Date: | 20.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1344039 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1344039 | Date: | 12.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/00 | [2003/38] | CPC: |
B01L3/502715 (EP,US);
B01L3/502707 (EP,US);
B81B1/002 (EP,US);
B01L2200/12 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0654 (EP,US);
B81B2201/058 (EP,US);
G01N27/44721 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER VORRICHTUNG MIT GEZOGENEN MIKROKANALREIHEN | [2005/42] | English: | METHOD OF MANUFACTURING DRAWN MICROCHANNEL ARRAY DEVICES | [2005/42] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DES DISPOSITIFS A MATRICE MICROCANAUX TIRES. | [2005/42] |
Former [2003/38] | VORRICHTUNG MIT GEZOGENEN MIKROKANALREIHEN UND ANALYSEMETHODE MIT VERWENDUNG DIESER VORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2003/38] | DRAWN MICROCHANNEL ARRAY DEVICES AND METHOD OF ANALYSIS USING SAME | ||
Former [2003/38] | DISPOSITIFS A MATRICE MICROCANAUX TIRES ET PROCEDE D'ANALYSE LES UTILISANT | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/38] | 21.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.04.2006 | BE | 12.04.2006 | CH | 12.04.2006 | CY | 12.04.2006 | FI | 12.04.2006 | FR | 12.04.2006 | IT | 12.04.2006 | LI | 12.04.2006 | TR | 12.04.2006 | SE | 12.07.2006 | GR | 13.07.2006 | ES | 23.07.2006 | PT | 12.09.2006 | IE | 13.12.2006 | LU | 13.12.2006 | MC | 31.12.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 12.04.2006 | |
BE | 12.04.2006 | ||
CH | 12.04.2006 | ||
FI | 12.04.2006 | ||
IT | 12.04.2006 | ||
LI | 12.04.2006 | ||
TR | 12.04.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
GR | 13.07.2006 | ||
ES | 23.07.2006 | ||
PT | 12.09.2006 | ||
IE | 13.12.2006 | ||
LU | 13.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 12.04.2006 | |
BE | 12.04.2006 | ||
CH | 12.04.2006 | ||
FI | 12.04.2006 | ||
IT | 12.04.2006 | ||
LI | 12.04.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
GR | 13.07.2006 | ||
ES | 23.07.2006 | ||
PT | 12.09.2006 | ||
IE | 13.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 12.04.2006 | |
BE | 12.04.2006 | ||
CH | 12.04.2006 | ||
FI | 12.04.2006 | ||
IT | 12.04.2006 | ||
LI | 12.04.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
ES | 23.07.2006 | ||
PT | 12.09.2006 | ||
IE | 13.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 12.04.2006 | |
BE | 12.04.2006 | ||
CH | 12.04.2006 | ||
FI | 12.04.2006 | ||
IT | 12.04.2006 | ||
LI | 12.04.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
ES | 23.07.2006 | ||
PT | 12.09.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 12.04.2006 | |
BE | 12.04.2006 | ||
CH | 12.04.2006 | ||
FI | 12.04.2006 | ||
LI | 12.04.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
ES | 23.07.2006 | ||
PT | 12.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | AT | 12.04.2006 | |
CH | 12.04.2006 | ||
FI | 12.04.2006 | ||
LI | 12.04.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
ES | 23.07.2006 | ||
PT | 12.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 12.04.2006 | |
CH | 12.04.2006 | ||
FI | 12.04.2006 | ||
LI | 12.04.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
ES | 23.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 12.04.2006 | |
FI | 12.04.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
ES | 23.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 12.07.2006 | |
ES | 23.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 12.07.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2189480 (PLESSEY CO PLC) [X] 1,37 * page 1, line 5 - page 1, line 23 * * page 2, line 32 - page 2, line 47 *; | [X]US5372625 (BREHM CLAUDE [FR], et al) [X] 1,4,37 * the whole document *; | [A]US6066020 (DEVOE NELSON CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [A] 1-37* column 3, line 9 - column 6, line 39 * |