EP1347901 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MONITORING AN AUTOMOTIVE SUBSYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.11.2005 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.01.2006 [2006/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2003/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HESS, Werner Zorndorfer Str. 23 70499 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
RIES-MUELLER, Klaus Heinsheimer Str. 47 74906 Bad Rappenau / DE | [2003/40] | Application number, filing date | 01985794.5 | 21.12.2001 | [2003/40] | WO2001DE04861 | Priority number, date | DE2000165769 | 30.12.2000 Original published format: DE 10065769 | [2003/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02053431 | Date: | 11.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1347901 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/00 | [2003/40] | CPC: |
B60T8/885 (EP,US);
B60T8/00 (KR);
B60T8/175 (EP,US);
B60T8/1755 (EP,US);
B60T2270/413 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUG-TEILSYSTEMS | [2003/40] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MONITORING AN AUTOMOTIVE SUBSYSTEM | [2003/40] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR CONTROLER UN SOUS-SYSTEME DE VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2003/40] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/40] | 01.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/01] | 08.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]EP0294803 (PFISTER GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-4,12-17,24,25 * claim 4 * [A] 8-10,20-22; | [A]DE19537039 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [A] 5 * Zusammenfassung *; | [A]DE19648055 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 6,7,18,19* figure 5 *; | [YA]DE19744725 (ITT MFG ENTERPRISES INC [US]) [Y] 1-4,12-17,24,25 * Das ganze Dokument * [A] 8-10,20-22; | [A]DE19936786 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [A] 11,23 * figure 1 * |