EP1349625 - TOY VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stadlbauer Spiel- und Freizeitartikel GmbH Südwestpark 94 90449 Nürnberg / DE | [2003/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MALEIKA, Hubertus Rebhuhnweg 12 90513 Zirndorf / DE | [2003/41] | Representative(s) | Zeitler, Giselher Zeitler Volpert Kandlbinder Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 26 02 51 80059 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/41] | Zeitler, Giselher Zeitler - Dickel - Kandlbinder, Herrnstrasse 44 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01985805.9 | 27.12.2001 | [2003/41] | WO2001DE04958 | Priority number, date | DE2001200473U | 11.01.2001 Original published format: DE 20100473 U | DE2001209329U | 05.06.2001 Original published format: DE 20109329 U | [2003/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02055166 | Date: | 18.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1349625 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1349625 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A63H31/00, A63H31/08, A63H29/00, F16H3/00 | [2003/41] | CPC: |
A63H17/00 (EP,US);
A63H31/00 (EP,US);
Y10T74/19367 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/41] | Title | German: | FAHRSPIELZEUG | [2003/41] | English: | TOY VEHICLE | [2003/41] | French: | VEHICULE-JOUET | [2003/41] | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/41] | 21.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.07.2004 | FI | 14.07.2004 | IE | 14.07.2004 | NL | 14.07.2004 | TR | 14.07.2004 | DK | 14.10.2004 | GR | 14.10.2004 | SE | 14.10.2004 | PT | 14.12.2004 | LU | 27.12.2004 | BE | 31.12.2004 | MC | 31.12.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/10] | CY | 14.07.2004 | |
FI | 14.07.2004 | ||
IE | 14.07.2004 | ||
NL | 14.07.2004 | ||
TR | 14.07.2004 | ||
DK | 14.10.2004 | ||
GR | 14.10.2004 | ||
SE | 14.10.2004 | ||
LU | 27.12.2004 | ||
BE | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 14.07.2004 | |
IE | 14.07.2004 | ||
NL | 14.07.2004 | ||
TR | 14.07.2004 | ||
DK | 14.10.2004 | ||
GR | 14.10.2004 | ||
SE | 14.10.2004 | ||
BE | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 14.07.2004 | |
IE | 14.07.2004 | ||
NL | 14.07.2004 | ||
DK | 14.10.2004 | ||
GR | 14.10.2004 | ||
SE | 14.10.2004 | ||
BE | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/51] | FI | 14.07.2004 | |
IE | 14.07.2004 | ||
DK | 14.10.2004 | ||
GR | 14.10.2004 | ||
SE | 14.10.2004 | ||
BE | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | FI | 14.07.2004 | |
IE | 14.07.2004 | ||
DK | 14.10.2004 | ||
GR | 14.10.2004 | ||
SE | 14.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 14.07.2004 | |
IE | 14.07.2004 | ||
DK | 14.10.2004 | ||
GR | 14.10.2004 | ||
SE | 14.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | FI | 14.07.2004 | |
DK | 14.10.2004 | ||
GR | 14.10.2004 | ||
SE | 14.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 14.07.2004 | |
GR | 14.10.2004 | ||
SE | 14.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 14.07.2004 | |
SE | 14.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 14.10.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2687658 (NELSON DONALD O, et al) [A] 1-3* column 1, lines 1-13; figure 1 *; | [XA]US4112615 (ISHIMOTO ZENICHI) [X] 1,3 * column 4, lines 10-47; figures 7,8 * [A] 2; | [DX]DE2722734 (NEUHIERL HERMANN) [DX] 1,3 * page 11, lines 8-19; figures 1-4 *; | [X]GB2016645 (WERBETRONIC AG) [X] 1,2 * page 1, lines 5-41; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | DE2722734 |