EP1355783 - ALUMINUM CLAD ZINC BIMETALLIC COIN PLANCHET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.2009 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.01.2010 [2010/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jarden Zinc Products, Inc. 2500 Old Stage Road Greeneville, TN 37743 / US | [2005/47] |
Former [2003/45] | For all designated states Alltrista Zinc Products L.P. 2500 Old Stage Road Greeneville, TN 37744-1890 / US | ||
Former [2003/44] | For all designated states Alterista Zinc Products, L.P. 2500 Old Stage Road Greeneville, TN 37744-1890 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEBER, Dennis, H. 7 Fox Den Court Johnson City, TN 37604 / US | [2003/44] | Representative(s) | Gosnall, Toby Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/45] | Gosnall, Toby Barker Brettell, 138 Hagley Road, Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | ||
Former [2003/44] | Trueman, Lucy Petra Barker Brettell, 138 Hagley Road, Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 01986146.7 | 11.12.2001 | [2003/44] | WO2001US47881 | Priority number, date | US20000740159 | 18.12.2000 Original published format: US 740159 | [2003/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0249837 | Date: | 27.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1355783 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.08.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B32B15/01, B32B15/20, C22C18/02 | [2004/40] | CPC: |
B32B15/20 (EP,US);
B32B15/01 (KR);
Y10T428/12243 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12736 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12792 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/44] | B32B15/01, B32B15/20 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, NL [2004/21] |
Former [2003/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIT ALUMINIUM BESCHICHTES ZINK-BIMETALLMÜNZPLÄTTCHEN | [2003/44] | English: | ALUMINUM CLAD ZINC BIMETALLIC COIN PLANCHET | [2003/44] | French: | FLAN BIMETALLIQUE EN ZINC A REVETEMENT D'ALUMINIUM | [2003/44] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2003 | Search fee paid | 16.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/44] | 10.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/01] | 24.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPS5471720 ; | [PX]MX9902889 ; | [X]US2100255 (LARSON CLAYTON E) [X] 1-3,12-14,25-27 * claims 13-15 *; | [A]US3525598 (RUSSELL ROBERT J, et al) [A] 1,12,25 * claims 1,2 *; | [X]DE1558700 (VER LEICHTMETALLWERKE GMBH) [X] 1,12,22,25 * figure .; claim 1 *; | [A]US3634926 (WINTER JOSEPH) [A] 1,12,25 * claims 1,2 *; | [XA] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1979, no. 29, Database accession no. 1979-53465B, page 23, XP002291015 & JPS5471720 A 19790608 (SUMITOMO LIGHT METAL IND) [X] 1,12,22,25 * column A * [A] 2,3,13,14,26,27 | [PX] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2003, no. 07, Database accession no. 2003-073956, page 13, XP002291016 & MX9902889 A 20011201 (UNIV AUTONOMA SAN UIS POTOSI) [PX] 1,12,22,25 * column A * | International search | [A]US2102869 (HERBERT WINTER); | [A]US3607147 (HARRISON BRIAN G); | [A]US3798028 (GERVAIS E, et al); | [A]US3940254 (MCMULLEN ARTHUR G, et al); | [A]US4330599 (WINTER JOSEPH, et al); | [A]US4401488 (PRINZ BRUNO [DE], et al); | [A]US4579761 (RUSCOE MICHAEL J H [CA], et al); | [A]US4599279 (MIRRA MICHAEL J [US], et al); | [A]US5472796 (BREEDIS JOHN F [US], et al); | [A]JPS52129628 (TOBA KOSAN KK) |