EP1330326 - DEVICE FOR REMOVING SOLDER MATERIAL FROM A SOLDERED JOINT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pac Tech - Packaging Technologies GmbH Am Schlangenhorst 15-17 14641 Nauen / DE | [2003/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZAKEL, Elke Reinicke Strasse 8 14612 Falkensee / DE | 02 /
KASULKE, Paul Tailheimer Strasse 4 74199 Untergruppenbach / DE | 03 /
UEBEL, Oliver Dieffenbachstrasse 45 10967 Berlin / DE | 04 /
TITERLE, Lars Wiener Strasse 38 10999 Berlin / DE | [2003/38] |
Former [2003/31] | 01 /
ZAKEL, Elke Reinicke Strasse 8 14612 Falkensee / DE | ||
02 /
KASULKE, Paul Wilhelmshavener Strasse 26 10551 Berlin / DE | |||
03 /
UEBEL, Oliver Dieffenbachstrasse 45 10967 Berlin / DE | |||
04 /
TITERLE, Lars Wiener Strasse 38 10999 Berlin / DE | Representative(s) | von Bülow, Tam Am Klueshoff 22 24955 Harrislee / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/31] | von Bülow, Tam, Dr. Patentanwalt, Mailänder Strasse 13 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01986281.2 | 02.10.2001 | [2003/31] | WO2001EP11418 | Priority number, date | DE20001049586 | 06.10.2000 Original published format: DE 10049586 | [2003/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0228582 | Date: | 11.04.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1330326 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1330326 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B23K1/018, B23K26/14 | [2003/31] | CPC: |
B23K26/1476 (EP,US);
B23K1/018 (EP,US);
B23K26/142 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2004/21] |
Former [2003/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM ENTFERNEN VON LOTMATERIAL VON EINER LÖTSTELLE | [2003/31] | English: | DEVICE FOR REMOVING SOLDER MATERIAL FROM A SOLDERED JOINT | [2003/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR ENLEVER UNE MATIERE D'APPORT DE SOUDAGE D'UN POINT SOUDE | [2003/31] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/31] | 22.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XDY]WO9857774 (PAC TECH GMBH [DE], et al) [XD] 1,12,22,29 * abstract * [Y] 2-4,6,8-10,13-16; | [X]JPH01133672 ; | [Y]DE3822097 (MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH [DE]) [Y] 2-4,6 * abstract *; | [Y]DE3208626 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 8,9 * abstract *; | [Y]DE4143414 (WEIDMUELLER INTERFACE [DE]) [Y] 10 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0635329 (FORTUNE WILLIAM S [US]) [Y] 13-16 * figures 1,5 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890823), vol. 013, no. 380, Database accession no. (M - 863), & JP01133672 A 19890525 (HITACHI LTD;OTHERS: 01) [X] 1,12,22 * abstract * | Examination | DE3931401 |