EP1345835 - DEVICE FOR THE SUSPENDED TRANSPORT OF STRIP OR SHEET MATERIAL IN A PROCESSING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Mülheimer Strasse 341 63075 Offenbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/39] | For all designated states MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Mühlheimer Strasse 341 63075 Offenbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KINS, Roland Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 58 63512 Hainburg / DE | 02 /
SEIDEL, Frank Schopenhauerstrasse 41 63303 Dreieich / DE | 03 /
FLOTOW, Steffen Spessartstrasse 24 63538 Grosskrotzenburg / DE | 04 /
WULF, Peter Dr. Markomannenstr. 17 50679 Köln / DE | 05 /
VAN DER KLEY, Vitt Thoedor-Heuss-Ring 58 63128 Dietzenbach / DE | 06 /
TRILLIG, Udo Wingertstrasse 5 63073 Offenbach / DE | [2004/02] |
Former [2003/39] | 01 /
KINS, Roland Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 5 63512 Hainburg / DE | ||
02 /
SEIDEL, Frank Schopenhauerstrasse 41 63303 Dreieich / DE | |||
03 /
FLOTOW, Steffen Spessartstrasse 24 63538 Grosskrotzenburg / DE | |||
04 /
WULF, Peter Dr. Markomannenstr. 17 50679 Köln / DE | |||
05 /
VAN DER KLEY, Vitt Thoedor-Heuss-Ring 58 63128 Dietzenbach / DE | |||
06 /
TRILLIG, Udo Wingertstrasse 5 63073 Offenbach / DE | Representative(s) | Stahl, Dietmar manroland AG Intellectual Property (IPB) Postfach 10 12 64 63012 Offenbach am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Stahl, Dietmar manroland AG Intellectual Property (IPB) Postfach 10 12 64 63012 Offenbach am Main / DE | ||
Former [2003/39] | Stahl, Dietmar, Dipl.-Ing. MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG, Mühlheimer Strasse 341 63075 Offenbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 01986860.3 | 11.12.2001 | [2003/39] | WO2001EP14504 | Priority number, date | DE2000164531 | 22.12.2000 Original published format: DE 10064531 | [2003/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02051732 | Date: | 04.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1345835 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1345835 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B65H23/24 | [2003/39] | CPC: |
B65H23/24 (EP);
B65H5/228 (EP);
B65H2406/112 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [2005/47] |
Former [2003/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHWEBENDEN FÜHREN VON BAHN- ODER BOGENMATERIAL IN EINER VERARBEITUNGSMASCHINE | [2003/39] | English: | DEVICE FOR THE SUSPENDED TRANSPORT OF STRIP OR SHEET MATERIAL IN A PROCESSING MACHINE | [2003/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRANSPORT FLOTTANT DE MATIERE EN BANDE OU EN FEUILLES DANS UNE MACHINE DE TRAITEMENT | [2003/39] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/39] | 27.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 22.03.2006 | GB | 22.03.2006 | IT | 22.03.2006 | SE | 22.06.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2007/37] | GB | 22.03.2006 | |
IT | 22.03.2006 | ||
SE | 22.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | GB | 22.03.2006 | |
SE | 22.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | SE | 22.06.2006 | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0695707 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [DA] 1 * column 8, line 34 - column 11, line 10; figures 6,9-16 *; | [A]DE19545799 (KBA PLANETA AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 26 - column 4, line 36; figures 7,8 *; | [A]EP0997419 (SPOONER IND LTD [GB]) [A] 1* column 12, line 49 - column 13, line 9; figures 6-9,19,20 * |