EP1457069 - MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK USING MOBILE STATION WITH RELAY-FUNCTION AND METHOD FOR REWARDING RELAY ACTIVITIES OF MOBILE STATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.10.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8010 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/38] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-8010 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKATANI, Yukihiro c/o Hitachi Ltd. Intel.Prop.Group New Marunouchi Bld.5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Nonaka, Naomichi c/o Hitachi Ltd. Intel.Prop.Group New Marunouchi Bld.5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 03 /
Hayashi, Masato c/o Hitachi Chemical Co. Ltd. 1-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0449 / JP | [2004/38] | Representative(s) | Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej, et al Venner Shipley LLP 406 Science Park Milton Road Cambridge CB4 0WW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/52] | Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej, et al Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB | ||
Former [2004/38] | Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 01986947.8 | 21.12.2001 | [2004/38] | WO2001EP15395 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03055246 | Date: | 03.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1457069 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/32, H04B7/26 | [2004/38] | CPC: |
H04W88/02 (EP,US);
H04B7/2606 (EP,US);
H04L45/00 (US);
H04W4/24 (EP,US);
H04W40/10 (EP,US);
H04W8/22 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOBILKOMMUNIKATIONSNETZ MIT MOBILSTATIONEN MIT WEITERLEITUNGS-FUNKTIONALITÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERGEBÜHRUNG VON WEITERLEITUNGS-AKTIVITÄTEN VON MOBILSTATIONEN | [2004/38] | English: | MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK USING MOBILE STATION WITH RELAY-FUNCTION AND METHOD FOR REWARDING RELAY ACTIVITIES OF MOBILE STATION | [2004/38] | French: | RESEAU DE COMMUNICATIONS MOBILE UTILISANT UNE STATION MOBILE A FONCTION DE RELAIS ET PROCEDE POUR ATTRIBUER LES ACTIVITES DE RELAIS DE LA STATION MOBILE | [2004/38] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 07.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/48] | 16.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5850593 (URATANI CHIKARA [JP]) [A] 1,14,15,19,21,24-26 * column 1, line 48 - column 2, line 41 * * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 23 * * column 4, line 64 - column 5, line 22; figures 1,3 *; | [A]WO0038443 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1,14,15,18,19,21,23-26* abstract *; | [A]WO0122757 (NOKIA NETWORKS OY [FI], et al) [A] 1,14,15,18,19,21,23-26 * page 1, line 6 - page 4, line 8; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE19961595 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,14,15,19,21,24-26 * column 3, line 2 - line 27; figure 1 *; | [A]WO0162026 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI], et al) [A] 1,14,15,18,19,21,23-26 * figure 3B; claims 8,9,18 * |