EP1919388 - TISSUE SITE MARKERS FOR IN VIVO IMAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Senorx, Inc. 1625 West 3rd Street Tempe, AZ 85280-1740 / US | [2011/41] |
Former [2010/41] | For all designated states Senorx, Inc. 3 Morgan Irvine, CA 92618 / US | ||
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states Senorx, Inc. Suite A, 11 Columbia Aliso Viejo, CA 92656 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURBANK, Fred, H. 12 Old Ranch Road Laguna Niguel, CA 92677 / US | 02 /
LUBOCK, Paul 30 Bethany Laguna Niguel, CA 92677 / US | 03 /
QUICK, Richard, L. 22970 Bouquet Canyon Mission Viejo, CA 92692 / US | 04 /
LOUW, Frank 6188 Paseo Tienda Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | 05 /
DE SANTIS, Stephen, A. 23802 Inverness PLace Laguna NIguel, CA 92677 / US | [2008/27] |
Former [2008/20] | 01 /
BURBANK, Fred, H. 12 Old Ranch Road Laguna Niguel, CA 92677 / US | ||
02 /
LUBOCK, Paul 30 Bethany Laguna Niguel, CA 92677 / US | |||
03 /
QUICK, Richard, L. 22970 Bouquet Canyon Mission Viejo, CA 92692 / US | |||
04 /
LOUW, Frank 2838 Cazadero Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | |||
05 /
DE SANTIS, Stephen, A. 23802 Inverness PLace Laguna NIguel, CA 92677 / US | Representative(s) | Tomlinson, Edward James, et al Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte P.O. Box 86 03 68 81630 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/36] | Tomlinson, Edward James, et al Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte P.O. Box 86 03 68 81630 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/30] | Barz, Peter Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2 80803 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/20] | Barz, Peter Kaiserplatz 2 80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01987032.8 | 16.11.2001 | [2008/20] | WO2001US43403 | Priority number, date | US20000717909 | 20.11.2000 Original published format: US 717909 | [2008/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0241786 | Date: | 30.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1919388 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1919388 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61M37/00, A61B19/00 | [2012/10] | CPC: |
A61B90/39 (EP,US);
A61M37/0069 (EP,US);
A61B2090/08021 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3908 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3925 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3987 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/20] | A61B19/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2008/20] | Title | German: | GEWEBESTELLEMARKER FÜR IN VIVO BILDDARSTELLUNGEN | [2008/20] | English: | TISSUE SITE MARKERS FOR IN VIVO IMAGING | [2008/20] | French: | MARQUEURS DE SITES TISSULAIRES POUR IMAGERIE IN VIVO | [2008/20] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 04.08.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 12.09.2003 | Examination requested [2008/20] | 19.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10182074.4 / EP2319449 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.09.2008 | Opposition(s) | 27.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.12.2012 | CY | 26.12.2012 | DK | 26.12.2012 | FI | 26.12.2012 | MC | 26.12.2012 | SE | 26.12.2012 | TR | 26.12.2012 | GR | 27.03.2013 | PT | 26.04.2013 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/33] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
MC | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 26.12.2012 | |
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | SE | 26.12.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0024332 (CORTESE ARMAND F [US]) [X] 1-10,12,19,22,26,27,29,30 * page 14, line 21 - page 15, line 12 * * page 15, line 20 - page 16, line 9 * * page 16, line 25 - line 32 * * page 17, line 7 - line 17 * * page 21, line 3 - page 22, line 1 * * page 22, line 10 - line 15 * * page 22, line 24 - line 34 *; | [XA]EP0386936 (VANCE PRODUCTS INC [US]) [X] 1-3,6-9,29,30 * abstract * * column 4, line 25 - line 27 * * column 7, line 37 - line 49 * * column 8, line 11 - line 14 * * column 8, line 36 - line 41 * * column 9, line 11 - line 12 * * figures 1-4,9-11 * [A] 14,15; | [X]EP0552924 (VANCE PRODUCTS INC [US]) [X] 1-3,6-9 * column 3, line 6 - line 13 * * column 3, line 38 - column 4, line 8 * * column 4, line 20 - line 27 * * column 4, line 41 - line 52 * * figure - *; | [X]US5394875 (LEWIS JUDITH T [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8,9 * column 1, line 8 - line 25 * * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 3 * * column 11, line 54 - column 12, line 14 * * figure 15 *; | [XA]WO0038579 (VIVANT MEDICAL INC [US], et al) [X] 32 * page 18, paragraph 2 * * page 21, paragraph 2 * * figures 1L,1M * [A] 1; | [A]US5469847 (ZINREICH SIMION J [US], et al) [A] 32 * column 3, line 6 - line 12 * * column 6, line 6 - line 16 * | Examination | US5201715 | by applicant | WO0024332 | EP0386936 |