EP1349503 - ANVIL ASSEMBLY FOR FORMING A STAPLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/41] | DIRECTIONALLY BIASED STAPLE AND ANVIL ASSEMBLY FOR FORMING THE STAPLE | ||
[2009/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tyco Healthcare Group LP 150 Glover Avenue Norwalk, Connecticut 06856 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/21] | For all designated states Tyco Healthcare Group LP 150 Glover Avenue Norwalk, CT 06856 / US | ||
Former [2004/05] | For all designated states Tyco Healthcare Group LP 150 Glover Avenue Norwalk, CT 06850 / US | ||
Former [2003/41] | For all designated states United States Surgical 150 Glover Avenue Norwalk, CT 06856 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RACENET, David, C. 157 Northfield Road Litchfield, CT 06759 / US | 02 /
BAYER, Hanspeter, R. 38 Lockwood Street Extension Meriden, CT 06451 / US | 03 /
CUNNINGHAM, Scott 10 Verdena Court Cheshire, CT 06410 / US | [2003/41] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/41] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01987644.0 | 19.10.2001 | [2003/41] | WO2001US50721 | Priority number, date | US20000693379 | 20.10.2000 Original published format: US 693379 | [2003/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0232322 | Date: | 25.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1349503 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1349503 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1349503 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | [2010/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/072 | [2009/42] | CPC: |
A61B17/0644 (EP,US);
A61B17/0682 (US);
A61B17/068 (EP,US);
A61B17/0684 (EP,US);
A61B17/0686 (EP,US);
A61B17/072 (EP,US);
A61B17/07207 (EP,US);
A61B17/115 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07264 (EP,US);
A61B2017/320052 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/41] | A61B17/064 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT [2004/20] |
Former [2003/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AMBOSSANORDNUNG ZUM FORMEN EINER KLAMMER | [2009/42] | English: | ANVIL ASSEMBLY FOR FORMING A STAPLE | [2009/42] | French: | ENSEMBLE ENCLUME POUR FORMER UNE AGRAFE | [2009/42] |
Former [2003/41] | RICHTUNGSVORGESPANNTE KLAMMER UND AMBOSSANORDNUNG ZUR BILDUNG DER KLAMMER | ||
Former [2003/41] | DIRECTIONALLY BIASED STAPLE AND ANVIL ASSEMBLY FOR FORMING THE STAPLE | ||
Former [2003/41] | AGRAFE SOLLICITEE DE MANIERE DIRECTIONNELLE ET ENSEMBLE ENCLUME POUR FORMER CETTE AGRAFE | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/41] | 12.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10155752.8 / EP2191778 | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1339394 (VNII KHIRURGICHESKOI APPARATUR) [A] 1* figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0251444 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0517975 (TAKASE HARUO [JP]) [X] 13,14,21,23,26,32-34 * figures 10-12 *; | [X]EP0541950 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]) [X] 13-34 * page 2, line 9 - line 15 * * page 4, line 52 - page 6, line 41; figures 6A,6B *; | [A]WO9518572 (ALPHA SURGICAL TECHNOLOGIES IN [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 56-59 *; | [DA]US5480089 (BLEWETT JEFFREY J [US]) [DA] 1 * column 3, line 8 - line 37 * |