EP1326553 - ELECTRICAL TOOTHBRUSH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GIMELLI PRODUKTIONS AG Webergutstrasse 5 CH-3052 Zollikofen / CH | [2003/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHÜTZ, Alfred Bernstrasse 107 CH-3052 Zollikofen / CH | [2003/29] | Representative(s) | Hebing, Norbert, et al Patentanwälte Schlagwein + Hebing Frankfurter Strasse 34 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/05] | Hebing, Norbert, et al Patentanwälte Schlagwein + Hebing, Frankfurter Strasse 34 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | ||
Former [2003/29] | Schlagwein, Udo, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Frankfurter Strasse 34 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 01987647.3 | 15.10.2001 | [2003/29] | WO2001EP11898 | Priority number, date | DE2000151256 | 16.10.2000 Original published format: DE 10051256 | DE2001106665 | 12.02.2001 Original published format: DE 10106665 | DE2001108373 | 21.02.2001 Original published format: DE 10108373 | [2003/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0232342 | Date: | 25.04.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1326553 | Date: | 16.07.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1326553 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61C17/34, A61C17/22 | [2003/29] | CPC: |
A61C17/222 (EP,US);
A61C17/3436 (EP,US);
A61C17/349 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE ZAHNBÜRSTE | [2003/29] | English: | ELECTRICAL TOOTHBRUSH | [2003/29] | French: | BROSSE A DENTS ELECTRIQUE | [2003/29] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/29] | 10.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 26.05.2004 | FI | 26.05.2004 | IE | 26.05.2004 | TR | 26.05.2004 | DK | 26.08.2004 | GR | 26.08.2004 | SE | 26.08.2004 | AT | 15.10.2004 | LU | 15.10.2004 | PT | 26.10.2004 | BE | 31.10.2004 | MC | 31.10.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/10] | CY | 26.05.2004 | |
FI | 26.05.2004 | ||
IE | 26.05.2004 | ||
TR | 26.05.2004 | ||
DK | 26.08.2004 | ||
GR | 26.08.2004 | ||
SE | 26.08.2004 | ||
AT | 15.10.2004 | ||
LU | 15.10.2004 | ||
BE | 31.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 26.05.2004 | |
IE | 26.05.2004 | ||
TR | 26.05.2004 | ||
DK | 26.08.2004 | ||
GR | 26.08.2004 | ||
SE | 26.08.2004 | ||
AT | 15.10.2004 | ||
BE | 31.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 26.05.2004 | |
IE | 26.05.2004 | ||
DK | 26.08.2004 | ||
GR | 26.08.2004 | ||
SE | 26.08.2004 | ||
AT | 15.10.2004 | ||
BE | 31.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/51] | FI | 26.05.2004 | |
IE | 26.05.2004 | ||
DK | 26.08.2004 | ||
GR | 26.08.2004 | ||
SE | 26.08.2004 | ||
BE | 31.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | FI | 26.05.2004 | |
IE | 26.05.2004 | ||
DK | 26.08.2004 | ||
GR | 26.08.2004 | ||
SE | 26.08.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/19] | FI | 26.05.2004 | |
IE | 26.05.2004 | ||
DK | 26.08.2004 | ||
GR | 26.08.2004 | ||
SE | 26.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 26.05.2004 | |
DK | 26.08.2004 | ||
GR | 26.08.2004 | ||
SE | 26.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | FI | 26.05.2004 | |
GR | 26.08.2004 | ||
SE | 26.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 26.05.2004 | |
SE | 26.08.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | SE | 26.08.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5617603 (MEI TZENG J N [TW]) [A] 1,5-7 * column 1, line 63 - column 2, line 61 ** figure - *; | [X]DE29914615U (MOSER ELEKTROGERAETE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * page 2, line 14 - page 3, line 3 * * page 5, lines 15-26 * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE19927297 (HOFMANN RAIMUND [DE]) [A] 1,3,4 * column 5, line 43 - column 6, line 1 * * figure 6 * | by applicant | WO9637164 |