EP1332076 - DEVICE FOR CONNECTING A WIPER ARM TO A WIPER BLADE AND WIPER ARM AND WIPER BLADE USING SUCH A DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 12.09.2007 [2007/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2006/17] |
Former [2003/32] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BASEOTTO, Michel Sint Druidersedeenweg 315, Box 4 B-3550 Hasselt / BE | 02 /
WILMS, Christian P. Van Houststraat 86/1 B-3582 Beringen / BE | 03 /
VERELST, Hubert Groot Overlaer 245 B-3300 Tienen / BE | 04 /
BREESCH, Frans Von Leewwen 21 B-3840 Borgloon / BE | 05 /
VANGEEL, Tom Stevoortweg 57 B-3540 Herk-de-Stad / BE | [2003/32] | Representative(s) | Kisselmann, Rudi, et al Robert Bosch GmbH Zentralabteilung Patente Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/32] | Kisselmann, Rudi, et al Robert Bosch GmbH Zentralabteilung Patente Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 01988672.0 | 26.10.2001 | [2003/32] | WO2001DE04020 | Priority number, date | DE2000153602 | 28.10.2000 Original published format: DE 10053602 | [2003/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0234593 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1332076 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1332076 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/40 | [2003/32] | CPC: |
B60S1/4041 (EP,US);
B60S1/40 (KR);
B60S1/32 (EP,US);
B60S1/38 (EP,US);
B60S1/3856 (EP,US);
B60S1/4038 (EP,US);
B60S2001/382 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [2004/22] |
Former [2003/32] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERBINDEN EINES WISCHERARMS MIT EINEM WISCHBLATT SOWIE WISCHERARM UND WISCHBLATT UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER SOLCHEN VORRICHTUNG | [2003/32] | English: | DEVICE FOR CONNECTING A WIPER ARM TO A WIPER BLADE AND WIPER ARM AND WIPER BLADE USING SUCH A DEVICE | [2003/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CONNEXION D'UN BRAS D'ESSUIE-GLACE A UN BALAI D'ESSUIE-GLACE ET BRAS D'ESSUIE-GLACE ET BALAI D'ESSUIE-GLACE FAISANT INTERVENIR UN TEL DISPOSITIF | [2003/32] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/32] | 18.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/14] | Request for further processing for: | 17.05.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 17.05.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.06.2005 | Decision despatched | 12.11.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 12.11.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.11.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 26.04.2006 | ES | 06.08.2006 | [2007/37] |
Former [2006/50] | ES | 06.08.2006 | Cited in | International search | [XA]DE19860644 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,9,10 * column 4, line 18 - column 6, line 6; figures 1-6 *[A] 2,4,6,8 |