EP1327094 - ACTUATOR FOR A VALVE, IN PARTICULAR A TURBINE VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/29] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEINBORN, Richard Höfer Weg 40 51377 Leverkusen / DE | [2003/29] | Application number, filing date | 01988833.8 | 11.10.2001 | [2003/29] | WO2001EP11799 | Priority number, date | EP20000122837 | 20.10.2000 Original published format: EP 00122837 | EP20010119339 | 10.08.2001 Original published format: EP 01119339 | [2003/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0235123 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1327094 | Date: | 16.07.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1327094 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/00, F16K31/06 | [2003/29] | CPC: |
F16K31/003 (EP,US);
F16K31/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2004/21] |
Former [2003/29] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | STELLANTRIEB FÜR EIN VENTIL, INSBESONDERE EIN TURBINENVENTIL | [2003/29] | English: | ACTUATOR FOR A VALVE, IN PARTICULAR A TURBINE VALVE | [2003/29] | French: | MECANISME DE COMMANDE POUR UNE SOUPAPE, EN PARTICULIER UNE SOUPAPE DE TURBINE | [2003/29] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/29] | 23.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/50] |
Former [2007/37] | IT | 18.01.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3017157 (PARSONS FLOYD B, et al) [A] 1,4,8,9* column 2, line 11 - line 19; figure 1 *; | [A]US3778027 (COLLINS R, et al) [A] 1,3,4 * column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 32; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0145828 (KOCH & MUELLER ARMATURENFAB [DE]) [A] 1 * page 6, line 1 - page 7, line 27; figures 1-3 *; | [X]DE29801229U (S & R MASCHBAU GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3-7 * page 9 - page 11, paragraph 3; figures 1,3 * | by applicant | DE1937198 | EP0040732 | EP0230849 | DE4446605 | WO9813633 | WO9949250 |