EP1334549 - HIGH PHASE ORDER MOTOR WITH MESH CONNECTED WINDINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.02.2010 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 24.03.2010 [2010/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Borealis Technical Limited Montagu Pavilion 8-10 Queensway Gibraltar / GI | [N/P] |
Former [2004/33] | For all designated states Borealis Technical Limited Montagu Pavilion 8-10 Queensway Gibraltar / GI | ||
Former [2003/33] | For all designated states Borealis Technical Limited 23545 N.W. Skyline Boulevard North Plians, OR 97133-9205 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EDELSON, Jonathan, Sidney 22 Adrian Street Somerville, MA 02143-3907 / US | [2003/33] | Representative(s) | Coates, Ian Harold, et al Scott & York Intellectual Property Limited 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/50] | Coates, Ian Harold, et al Scott & York Intellectual Property Limited 45 Grosvenor Road St Albans, Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB | ||
Former [2003/33] | Coates, Ian Harold, et al Sommerville & Rushton, 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans, Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB | Application number, filing date | 01988968.2 | 22.10.2001 | [2003/33] | WO2001US46340 | Priority number, date | US20000242622P | 23.10.2000 Original published format: US 242622 P | US20000713654 | 15.11.2000 Original published format: US 713654 | [2003/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0235689 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1334549 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.05.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H02K17/14 | [2004/38] | CPC: |
H02K3/28 (EP,US);
H02K17/12 (EP,US);
H02P27/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/33] | H02K37/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/33] | Title | German: | MOTOR MIT HOHER PHASENORDNUNG MIT MASCHENVERBINDUNGSWICKLUNGEN | [2003/33] | English: | HIGH PHASE ORDER MOTOR WITH MESH CONNECTED WINDINGS | [2003/33] | French: | MOTEUR A ORDRE DE PHASE ELEVE COMPORTANT DES ENROULEMENTS RELIES EN RESEAU | [2003/33] | Entry into regional phase | 01.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 01.05.2003 | Search fee paid | 01.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 30.04.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/33] | 06.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.10.2009 | 08.10.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.10.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 06.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/12] | 16.11.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2004 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   21.04.2005 | 31.10.2007 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   26.03.2008 | 31.10.2008 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   01.05.2009 | 31.10.2009 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2003639 (UNGER FRANZ PROF DR) [X] 1,53 * page 1, paragraph 2; figure 1 *; | [A]US4751448 (AUINGER HERBERT [DE]) [A] 1,39,53 * figures 2-24; claim 1 *; | [A]US5189357 (WOODSON HERBERT H [US], et al) [A] 1,39,53 * figure 18; claims 17,18 *; | [X]WO0051229 (BOREALIS TECH LTD [US]) [X] 1-56 * page 12, line 34 - page 13, line 8; figure 2 *; | [A] - KATS Y, "Adjustable-speed drives with multiphase motors", ELECTRIC MACHINES AND DRIVES CONFERENCE RECORD, 1997. IEEE INTERNATIONAL MILWAUKEE, WI, USA 18-21 MAY 1997, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19970518), ISBN 0-7803-3946-0, pages TC2 - 41, XP010231812 [A] 1,39,53 | International search | [YP]US6153953 (ISOZAKI KOUKI [JP], et al); | [Y]US4607204 (SETOYA NOBORU [JP]); | [Y]US4755732 (ANDO ATSUSHI [JP]) |