EP1345972 - METHOD FOR STERILIZING CYANOACRYLATE COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 22.02.2008 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2008 | Refusal of application | published on 26.03.2008 [2008/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medlogic Global Limited Road Three, Winsford Industrial Estate Winsford Cheshire CW7 3PD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/39] | For all designated states Medlogic Global Limited Road Three, Winsford Industrial Estate Winsford, Cheshire CW7 3PD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASKILL, Ian, N. 6572 Foxdale Circle Colorado Springs, CO 80919 / US | 02 /
KARNIK, Shane, C. 23 Meadow Drive Gales Ferry, CT 06335 / US | 03 /
NORTON, Richard, L. 419 South Impala Drive 9 Fort Collins, CO 80521 / US | [2003/39] | Representative(s) | Atkinson, Peter Birch, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/39] | Atkinson, Peter Birch, et al MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 01989095.3 | 21.11.2001 | [2003/39] | WO2001US43270 | Priority number, date | US20000252832P | 21.11.2000 Original published format: US 252832 P | [2005/12] |
Former [2003/39] | US20000352832P | 21.11.2000 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02054934 | Date: | 18.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1345972 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.05.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/46, C07C253/34 | [2005/10] | CPC: |
C07C253/34 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C253/34, C07C255/23 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2003/39] | C08F2/46 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STERILISIERUNG VON CYANACRYLATZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2003/39] | English: | METHOD FOR STERILIZING CYANOACRYLATE COMPOSITIONS | [2003/39] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE STERILISER DES COMPOSITIONS DE CYANOACRYLATE | [2003/39] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2003 | Search fee paid | 04.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 04.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/39] | 13.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.07.2007 | 05.07.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 06.07.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 10.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/13] | 20.10.2007 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3704089 (STEHLIK GERHARD) [Y] 1-14 * claim 1, column 1, lines 23-56 *; | [YD]US5925885 (CLARK REGINALD WAYNE [US], et al) [YD] 1-14* claims, column 11, lines 28-46 * | International search | [X]US6055828 ; | [Y]US6143805 ; | [YP]US6248800 ; | [Y]US5998472 ; | [Y]WO0016615 ; | [YP]US6310166 ; | [A]US5874044 ; | [Y]US5530037 ; | [A]US5496302 ; | [A]US5258423 ; | [A]US4652763 |