EP1348131 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MONITORING WHEEL SPEEDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.12.2005 [2005/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2003/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KACHEL, Gerhard Dreisamstrasse 22 76199 Karlsruhe / DE | 02 /
BRAUN, Thomas Haydnweg 11 71711 Murr / DE | [2003/40] | Application number, filing date | 01990301.2 | 13.12.2001 | [2003/40] | WO2001DE04698 | Priority number, date | DE2000164503 | 22.12.2000 Original published format: DE 10064503 | [2003/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02052282 | Date: | 04.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1348131 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01P21/02, B60T8/88 | [2003/40] | CPC: |
B60T8/885 (EP,US);
G01P21/02 (EP,US);
B60T2270/416 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ÜBERWACHEN VON RADGESCHWINDIGKEITEN | [2003/40] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MONITORING WHEEL SPEEDS | [2003/40] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR SURVEILLER LA VITESSE DE ROUES | [2003/40] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/40] | 02.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/51] | 19.07.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3861760 (HAMELIN GILBERT) [A] 1,12* abstract *; | [A]EP0369179 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1,12 * abstract *; | [A]US5562327 (FENNEL HELMUT [DE], et al) [A] 1,10 * abstract * * column 2, paragraph 5 * * column 5, paragraph 4 *; | [A]DE19521411 (VDO SCHINDLING [DE]) [A] 1,12 * abstract *; | [A]DE19853380 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [A] 1,12 * column 2, line 47 - column 4, line 55 * |