EP1354248 - METHOD FOR SIMULATING A MECHATRONIC SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2007 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.05.2007 [2007/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/43] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAMM, Carsten Oppelner Strasse 2 91058 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
LOUIS, Michael Am Römerweg 1 54439 Fisch / DE | 03 /
PAPIERNIK, Wolfgang Im See 21 91077 Neunkrichen / DE | [2003/49] |
Former [2003/43] | 01 /
HAMM, Carsten Oppelner Strasse 2 91058 Erlangen / DE | ||
02 /
LOUIS, Michael Linnestrasse 13 90443 Nürnberg / DE | |||
03 /
PAPIERNIK, Wolfgang Im See 21 91077 Neunkrichen / DE | Application number, filing date | 01990371.5 | 21.12.2001 | [2003/43] | WO2001DE04890 | Priority number, date | DE2001102313 | 18.01.2001 Original published format: DE 10102313 | DE2001137909 | 02.08.2001 Original published format: DE 10137909 | [2003/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02057857 | Date: | 25.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1354248 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1354248 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G05B17/02 | [2003/43] | CPC: |
G05B17/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/25] |
Former [2003/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SIMULATION MECHATRONISCHER SYSTEME | [2003/43] | English: | METHOD FOR SIMULATING A MECHATRONIC SYSTEM | [2003/43] | French: | PROCEDE POUR LA SIMULATION DE SYSTEMES MECATRONIQUES | [2003/43] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/43] | 21.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0275664 (LORD CORP [US]) [A] 1 * page 5, line 24 - page 6, line 28 *; | [A] - KAPUCU S ET AL, "TUTORIAL NOTE ON THE IDENTIFICATION OF LINEAR MECHANICAL SYSTEMS", MECHATRONICS, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, (199704), vol. 3, no. 7, ISSN 0957-4158, pages 297 - 313, XP001076837 [A] 1 * page 297, line 1 - page 303, line 22 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0957-4158(97)00002-0 | [A] - L.KOPHAPUT, "LINEARISIERUNG DER DIFFERENTIALGLEICHUNGEN DES EINMASSENSCHWINGERS FÜR BELIEBIGE,EINDEUTIGE KENNLINIEN MIT ANWENDUNGEN IM AUTOMOBILBAU", INGENIEUR ARCHIV, WEST GERMANY, (1985), vol. 55, no. 3, pages 186 - 201, XP008003166 [A] 1 * page 186, line 1 - page 190, line 15 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00536413 |