EP1342329 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ENHANCING A GLOBAL POSITIONING POSITIONING SYSTEM WITH A TERRAIN MODEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2009/35] |
Former [2003/37] | For all designated states Global Locate, Inc. 208 Harristown Road Glen Rock, NJ 07452 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIGGELEN, Frank, van 1005 Alamitos Creek Drive San Jose, CA 94120 / US | 02 /
ABRAHAM, Charles 5803 Newgate Court San Jose, CA 95138 / US | [2003/37] | Representative(s) | Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstraße 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/35] | Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/52] | Bosch, Matthias, et al Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/43] | Bosch, Matthias, et al Bosch Graf von Stosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstraße 13 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/37] | Dawson, Elizabeth Ann, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 01990915.9 | 13.11.2001 | [2003/37] | WO2001US47162 | Priority number, date | US20000249604P | 17.11.2000 Original published format: US 249604 P | US20010811796 | 19.03.2001 Original published format: US 811796 | [2003/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0241027 | Date: | 23.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1342329 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1342329 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.11.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/185, G01S1/00, G01S5/14 | [2004/45] | CPC: |
G01S19/50 (EP,US);
G01S19/01 (KR);
G01S19/13 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2003/37] | H04B7/185, G01S1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERBESSERUNG EINES GLOBALEN NAVIGATIONSSYSTEMS MIT EINEM TERRAINMODELL | [2003/37] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ENHANCING A GLOBAL POSITIONING POSITIONING SYSTEM WITH A TERRAIN MODEL | [2003/37] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT D'AMELIORER UN SYSTEME DE POSITIONNEMENT GLOBAL GRACE A UN MODELE DE TERRAIN | [2003/37] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2003 | Search fee paid | 21.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/37] | 06.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.09.2010 | 15.09.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 02.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.05.2011 | BE | 18.05.2011 | CY | 18.05.2011 | DK | 18.05.2011 | FI | 18.05.2011 | IT | 18.05.2011 | NL | 18.05.2011 | SE | 18.05.2011 | TR | 18.05.2011 | GR | 19.08.2011 | ES | 29.08.2011 | PT | 19.09.2011 | IE | 13.11.2011 | LU | 13.11.2011 | CH | 30.11.2011 | LI | 30.11.2011 | MC | 30.11.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/25] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
IT | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
IE | 13.11.2011 | ||
LU | 13.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
IT | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
IE | 13.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
IT | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/29] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
IT | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
IT | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 18.05.2011 | |
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | PT | 19.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6061018 (SHEYNBLAT LEONID [US]) [X] 1-3,6,12-20,30* column 9, line 10 - column 10, line 13; figures 5,6,5a,5b * | International search | [X]US4949268 (NISHIKAWA KUNITOSHI [JP], et al); | [X]US6047227 (HENDERSON DANIEL E [US], et al); | [X]US6094607 (DIESEL JOHN W [US]) |