EP1344133 - A METHOD OF IMPROVING THE AVAILABILITY OF A COMPUTER CLUSTERING SYSTEM THROUGH THE USE OF A NETWORK MEDIUM LINK STATE FUNCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMC CORPORATION 176 South Street Hopkinton, MA 01748 / US | [2008/48] |
Former [2004/37] | For all designated states EMC Corporation 176 South Street Hopkinton, MA 01748 / US | ||
Former [2003/38] | For all designated states Legato Systems Inc. 2350 West El Camino Real Mountain View, California 94040 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRICE, Daniel, M. 11030 Manor Circle Highland, UT 84003 / US | [2003/38] | Representative(s) | Gover, Richard Paul Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/51] | Gover, Richard Paul Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2003/38] | Orr, William McLean Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, Tower House, Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01991440.7 | 19.12.2001 | [2003/38] | WO2001US49600 | Priority number, date | US20000257478P | 21.12.2000 Original published format: US 257478 P | US20010855592 | 14.05.2001 Original published format: US 855592 | [2003/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0250678 | Date: | 27.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1344133 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1344133 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.06.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/20 | [2007/33] | CPC: |
G06F11/2028 (EP,US);
G06F11/00 (KR);
G06F11/2035 (EP,US);
G06F11/2071 (EP,US);
G06F11/2023 (EP,US);
G06F11/2094 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2003/38] | G06F11/00, G06F11/20, G06F11/30, G06F11/14, G06F11/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER VERFÜGBARKEIT EINES COMPUTER-CLUSTERUNGSSYSTEMS DURCH VERWENDUNG EINER NETZWERK-MEDIUM-VERKNÜPFUNGSZUSTANDSFUNKTION | [2008/29] | English: | A METHOD OF IMPROVING THE AVAILABILITY OF A COMPUTER CLUSTERING SYSTEM THROUGH THE USE OF A NETWORK MEDIUM LINK STATE FUNCTION | [2003/38] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREVENTION DES DECONNEXIONS CEREBRALES DANS DES SYSTEMES A CONFIGURATION EN GRAPPE | [2003/38] |
Former [2003/38] | VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER VERFÜGBARKEIT EINES COMPUTER-CLUSTERUNGSSYSTEM DURCH VERWENDUNG EINER NETZWERK-MEDIUM-VERKNÜPFUNGSZUSTANDSFUNKTION | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2003 | Search fee paid | 29.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 03.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/38] | 27.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.11.2008 | BE | 26.11.2008 | CY | 26.11.2008 | DK | 26.11.2008 | FI | 26.11.2008 | IT | 26.11.2008 | NL | 26.11.2008 | TR | 26.11.2008 | IE | 19.12.2008 | LU | 19.12.2008 | CH | 31.12.2008 | LI | 31.12.2008 | MC | 31.12.2008 | SE | 26.02.2009 | GR | 27.02.2009 | ES | 08.03.2009 | PT | 27.04.2009 | [2014/32] |
Former [2010/47] | AT | 26.11.2008 | |
BE | 26.11.2008 | ||
CY | 26.11.2008 | ||
DK | 26.11.2008 | ||
FI | 26.11.2008 | ||
NL | 26.11.2008 | ||
TR | 26.11.2008 | ||
IE | 19.12.2008 | ||
LU | 19.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 26.02.2009 | ||
GR | 27.02.2009 | ||
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
PT | 27.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/37] | AT | 26.11.2008 | |
BE | 26.11.2008 | ||
CY | 26.11.2008 | ||
DK | 26.11.2008 | ||
FI | 26.11.2008 | ||
NL | 26.11.2008 | ||
TR | 26.11.2008 | ||
IE | 19.12.2008 | ||
LU | 19.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 26.02.2009 | ||
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
PT | 27.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 26.11.2008 | |
BE | 26.11.2008 | ||
CY | 26.11.2008 | ||
DK | 26.11.2008 | ||
FI | 26.11.2008 | ||
NL | 26.11.2008 | ||
IE | 19.12.2008 | ||
LU | 19.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 26.02.2009 | ||
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
PT | 27.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 26.11.2008 | |
BE | 26.11.2008 | ||
DK | 26.11.2008 | ||
FI | 26.11.2008 | ||
NL | 26.11.2008 | ||
IE | 19.12.2008 | ||
LU | 19.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 26.02.2009 | ||
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
PT | 27.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 26.11.2008 | |
BE | 26.11.2008 | ||
DK | 26.11.2008 | ||
FI | 26.11.2008 | ||
NL | 26.11.2008 | ||
IE | 19.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 26.02.2009 | ||
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
PT | 27.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/37] | AT | 26.11.2008 | |
BE | 26.11.2008 | ||
DK | 26.11.2008 | ||
FI | 26.11.2008 | ||
NL | 26.11.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 26.02.2009 | ||
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
PT | 27.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 26.11.2008 | |
BE | 26.11.2008 | ||
DK | 26.11.2008 | ||
FI | 26.11.2008 | ||
NL | 26.11.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | AT | 26.11.2008 | |
BE | 26.11.2008 | ||
FI | 26.11.2008 | ||
NL | 26.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | AT | 26.11.2008 | |
FI | 26.11.2008 | ||
NL | 26.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 26.11.2008 | |
ES | 08.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 08.03.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0760503 (COMPAQ COMPUTER CORP [US]) [X] 1-5,8-12,19-21,23 * abstract * * column 1, lines 42-53 * * column 3, lines 37-54 * * column 4, line 50 - column 5, line 14 * * column 5, lines 36-38 * * column 11, lines 2-12 ** column 13, lines 20-56 *; | [X]US5812748 (OHRAN RICHARD S [US], et al) [X] 1-23 * abstract * * figures 2,3,5,7 * * column 3, line 19 - column 4, line 29 * * column 6, lines 27-53 * * column 7, lines 14-52 * * column 11, line 51 - column 12, line 61 *; | [X]US6134673 (CHRABASZCZ MICHAEL [US]) [X] 1-23 * abstract * * column 1, lines 50-58 * * column 2, line 38 - column 4, line 11 * * column 5, lines 40-52 * * column 6, lines 12-38 * * column 9, lines 65-18 * * column 9, line 60 - column 10, line 12 *; | [X]US6151688 (WIPFEL ROBERT A [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8-12,19-21,23 * abstract * * column 2, line 57 - column 4, line 31 * * column 9, line 8 - column 10, line 19 * | International search | [A]EP0810526 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]); | [A]WO9833121 (TANDEM COMPUTERS INC [US]); | [A]US5828889 (MOIIN HOSSEIN [US], et al); | [A]US5884018 (JARDINE ROBERT L [US], et al); | [A]US5892895 (BASAVAIAH MURALI [US], et al); | [A]US5948109 (MOIIN HOSSEIN [US], et al); | [A]US5991518 (JARDINE ROBERT L [US], et al); | [A]US5999712 (MOIIN HOSSEIN [US], et al); | [A]US6002851 (BASAVAIAH MURALI [US], et al); | [A]US6108699 (MOIIN HOSSEIN [US]); | [A]US6145089 (LE HUNG [US], et al); | [AP]US6192483 (MOIIN HOSSEIN [US], et al); | [AP]US6279032 (SHORT ROBERT T [US], et al); | [AP]US6311217 (EHLINGER EARLY DAVID [US], et al); | [AE]US6338112 (WIPFEL ROBERT A [US], et al); | [AE]US6353898 (WIPFEL ROBERT A [US], et al); | [A] - MURRAY P.T. ET AL., "Somersault: enabling fault-tolerant distributed software systems", HP LABORATORIES PUBLICATION HPL-98-81, (199804), pages 1 - 18, XP002908655 | [A] - YANG C.-L. ET AL., "Hybrid fault diagnosability with unreliable communication links", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMPUTERS, (198802), vol. 37, no. 2, pages 175 - 181, XP002908654 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/12.2146 |