EP1347884 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MONITORING THE VEHICLE DYNAMICS OF A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.01.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.2005 [2005/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2003/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HESSMERT, Ulrich Richard-Wagner-Strasse 35 71701 Schwieberdingen / DE | 02 /
POLZIN, Norbert Burgunderweg 1 74374 Zaberfeld / DE | 03 /
WANDEL, Helmut Kelterstr. 33 71706 Markgroeningen / DE | 04 /
SAUTER, Thomas Silcherstr. 19 71686 Remseck / DE | 05 /
BRACHERT, Jost Gottfried-Keller-Strasse 39 71254 Ditzingen / DE | [2003/40] | Application number, filing date | 01991680.8 | 22.12.2001 | [2003/40] | WO2001DE04907 | Priority number, date | DE2000165765 | 30.12.2000 Original published format: DE 10065765 | DE2001122405 | 09.05.2001 Original published format: DE 10122405 | [2003/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02053397 | Date: | 11.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1347884 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B60G17/015 | [2003/40] | CPC: |
B60G17/0185 (EP,US);
B60G2400/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2004/22] |
Former [2003/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM ÜBERWACHEN DES FAHRZUSTANDS EINES FAHRZEUGS | [2003/40] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MONITORING THE VEHICLE DYNAMICS OF A VEHICLE | [2003/40] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE SURVEILLANCE DE L'ETAT DE MARCHE D'UN VEHICULE | [2003/40] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/40] | 14.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/09] | 30.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US4887454 (KYRTSOS CHRISTOS T [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7,9,10,13-15 * column 2, line 5 - column 8, line 56; figures 1-5 * [Y] 3,4; | [Y]EP0432122 (SKF NOVA AB [SE]) [Y] 3 * column 4, line 10 - column 5, line 14; figures 1-9 *; | [XY]EP0455993 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,17 * page 3, line 5 - page 7, line 58; figures 1-6 * [Y] 4; | [A]US5895854 (BECHERER THOMAS [DE], et al) [A] 17* column 4, line 64 - column 5, line 65; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5913240 (DRAEHNE EBERHARD [DE], et al) [A] 17 * column 20, line 40 - column 22, line 63; figures 1-10 * |