EP1360251 - TYRE WITH COLOURED, METALLISED SURFACE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.12.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société de Technologie Michelin 23 rue Breschet 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 09 / FR | For all designated states Michelin Recherche et Technique S.A. Route Louis Braille 10 et 12 1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | [2010/08] |
Former [2003/46] | For all designated states Société de Technologie Michelin 23 rue Breschet 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 09 / FR | ||
For all designated states Michelin Recherche et Technique S.A. Route Louis Braille 10 et 12 1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COTTIN, Alain 15, rue du Temple, Bâtiment B F-63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | 02 /
PEYRON, Georges 38, rue des Charmettes F-63200 Riom / FR | [2003/46] | Representative(s) | Le Cam, Véronique Marie Christine Manufacture Française des Pneumatiques Michelin CBS/CORP/J/PI - F35 - Ladoux 23, place des Carmes - Déchaux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/46] | Le Cam, Véronique Marie Christine M.F.P. Michelin, SGD/LG/PI, F35, Ladoux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand-Cedex 9 / FR | Application number, filing date | 01991874.7 | 21.12.2001 | [2003/46] | WO2001EP15187 | Priority number, date | FR20000017347 | 29.12.2000 Original published format: FR 0017347 | [2003/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02053661 | Date: | 11.07.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1360251 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1360251 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C09D175/04, C08J7/04, C08K3/08, B60C1/00, C08K3/00 | [2003/46] | CPC: |
B60C1/0016 (EP,US);
C09D175/04 (EP,KR,US);
B60C1/0025 (EP,US);
B60C11/1346 (EP,US);
B60C13/001 (EP,US);
C08J7/0427 (EP,US);
C08J7/043 (EP,US);
C08G2380/00 (EP,US);
C08J2321/00 (EP,US);
C08J2475/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REIFEN MIT EINER GEFÄRBTEN, METALLISIERTEN OBERFLÄCHENZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2003/46] | English: | TYRE WITH COLOURED, METALLISED SURFACE COMPOSITION | [2003/46] | French: | PNEUMATIQUE AYANT UNE COMPOSITION COLOREE METALISEE DE SURFACE | [2003/46] | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/46] | 08.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.02.2010 | CY | 24.02.2010 | DK | 24.02.2010 | FI | 24.02.2010 | IE | 24.02.2010 | IT | 24.02.2010 | NL | 24.02.2010 | SE | 24.02.2010 | TR | 24.02.2010 | GR | 25.05.2010 | ES | 04.06.2010 | PT | 25.06.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2011/14] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
CY | 24.02.2010 | ||
DK | 24.02.2010 | ||
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
IE | 24.02.2010 | ||
IT | 24.02.2010 | ||
NL | 24.02.2010 | ||
SE | 24.02.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
ES | 04.06.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
CY | 24.02.2010 | ||
DK | 24.02.2010 | ||
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
IE | 24.02.2010 | ||
NL | 24.02.2010 | ||
SE | 24.02.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
ES | 04.06.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
CY | 24.02.2010 | ||
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
IE | 24.02.2010 | ||
NL | 24.02.2010 | ||
SE | 24.02.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
ES | 04.06.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
CY | 24.02.2010 | ||
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
IE | 24.02.2010 | ||
NL | 24.02.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
ES | 04.06.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
IE | 24.02.2010 | ||
NL | 24.02.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
ES | 04.06.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
NL | 24.02.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/37] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | PT | 25.06.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH07126431 ; | [A]US4158378 (PEARSON CHARLES J, et al) [A] 1,5,11,12,15-17 * column 1, line 31 - column 2, line 55 * * example 1 *; | [A]US5417515 (HACHEY KATHLEEN A [US], et al) [A] 1* column 2, line 9 - line 40; example 1 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1995, no. 28, Database accession no. 1995-213071, XP002176861 & JPH07126431 A 19950516 (KOUEN SHISETSU KAIHATSU GIGYO KYODO KUMI) [A] 1 * abstract * |