EP1402375 - WEB PAGE ANNOTATION SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [2010/36] |
Former [2004/14] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STOLZE, Markus Zopfstrasse 15 CH-8134 Adliswil / CH | [2004/14] | Representative(s) | Klett, Peter Michael, et al c/o IBM Deutschland Management & Business Support GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht Postfach 71137 Ehningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/38] | Klett, Peter Michael, et al IBM Research GmbH Zurich Research Laboratory Intellectual Property Law Säumerstrasse 4 8803 Rüschlikon / CH | ||
Former [2009/18] | Burt, Roger James, et al IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Law Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | ||
Former [2004/14] | Klett, Peter Michael International Business Machines Corporation, Säumerstrasse 4 / Postfach 8803 Rüschlikon / CH | Application number, filing date | 01992238.4 | 28.12.2001 | [2004/14] | WO2001US49641 | Priority number, date | EP20010810439 | 04.05.2001 Original published format: EP 01810439 | [2004/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02091193 | Date: | 14.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1402375 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1402375 | Date: | 08.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.11.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2010/15] | CPC: |
G06Q30/02 (EP);
G06Q30/06 (KR);
G06F16/986 (EP);
G06F40/169 (EP);
G06Q50/10 (KR);
H04L67/02 (EP);
H04L67/142 (EP);
H04L67/306 (EP);
H04L67/561 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2004/14] | G06F13/00, G06F15/16, G06F15/173, G06F17/00, G06F17/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WEBSEITEN-ANNOTATIONSSYSTEME | [2004/14] | English: | WEB PAGE ANNOTATION SYSTEMS | [2004/14] | French: | SYSTEMES D'ANNOTATION DE PAGES WEB | [2004/14] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2004 | Search fee paid | 28.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 28.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/14] | 13.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 28.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.09.2010 | BE | 08.09.2010 | CY | 08.09.2010 | DK | 08.09.2010 | FI | 08.09.2010 | IT | 08.09.2010 | NL | 08.09.2010 | SE | 08.09.2010 | TR | 08.09.2010 | GR | 09.12.2010 | ES | 19.12.2010 | IE | 28.12.2010 | LU | 28.12.2010 | CH | 31.12.2010 | LI | 31.12.2010 | MC | 31.12.2010 | PT | 10.01.2011 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
IE | 28.12.2010 | ||
LU | 28.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
IE | 28.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 08.09.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0004434 (B E TECHNOLOGY LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * abstract * * page 2, line 30 - page 3, line 6 * * page 14, line 23 - page 15, line 12 * * page 15, line 30 - page 16, line 9 * * page 20, line 6 - line 16 * * page 21, line 16 - line 24 * * page 26, line 8 - line 9 * * page 26, line 22 - line 23 * * page 28, line 12 - line 23 * * page 32, line 5 - page 35, line 8 * * page 39, line 24 - page 42, line 25 *; | [A]US6134532 (LAZARUS MICHAEL A [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - column 4, line 6 * * column 4, line 55 - column 5, line 57 *; | [A]EP1061465 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-24 * abstract * * claim 13 *; | [A] - GALLAGHER K ET AL, "A framework for targeting banner advertising on the Internet", SYSTEM SCIENCES, 1997, PROCEEDINGS OF THE THIRTIETH HWAII INTERNATIONA L CONFERENCE ON WAILEA, HI, USA 7-10 JAN. 1997, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19970107), vol. 4, ISBN 978-0-8186-7743-4, pages 265 - 274, XP010271845 [A] 1-24 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [03.1] - paragraph [03.2] * * paragraph [04.2] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/HICSS.1997.663397 | [A] - SCHLOSS R J, "Novel business uses of independently created hyperlinks in the World Wide Web: basic mechanism and examples", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL HAWAII INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ONSYSTEM SCIENCES, XX, XX, (19960103), vol. 2, pages 137 - 146, XP002151364 [A] 1-24 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [02.1] * * paragraph [02.5] * | International search | [Y]US5999929 (GOODMAN MARC I [US]); | [Y]US6182072 (LEAK BRUCE A [US], et al); | [A]US6185614 (CUOMO GENNARO A [US], et al); | [AP]US6237035 (HIMMEL MARIA AZUA [US], et al); | [AP]US6243750 (VERMA DINESH CHANDRA [US]); | [YP]US6253204 (GLASS BOB [US], et al) |