EP1347822 - TWO STAGE DIAFILTRATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/40] | TWO STAGE DIAFILTRATION METHOD AND APPARATUS | ||
[2011/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nephros, Inc. 3960 Broadway New York, NY 10032 / US | [2003/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COLLINS, Gregory, R. 113 Second Avenue Monroe, NY 10950 / US | 02 /
SUMMERTON, James 88 Ralph Avenue Hillsdale, NJ 07642 / US | 03 /
SPENCE, Edward 4421 Edson Avenue Bronx, NY 10466 / US | [2003/40] | Representative(s) | Held, Stephan, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/40] | Held, Stephan, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Postfach 86 03 29 81630 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01992608.8 | 30.10.2001 | [2003/40] | WO2001US45368 | Priority number, date | US20000702046 | 30.10.2000 Original published format: US 702046 | [2003/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0236247 | Date: | 10.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1347822 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1347822 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.05.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B01D61/24, B01D61/28, B01D61/32, B01D63/00 | [2003/40] | CPC: |
A61M1/3413 (EP,US);
A61M1/3417 (EP,US);
A61M1/342 (EP,US);
A61M1/3434 (EP,US);
A61M1/3437 (EP,US);
A61M1/3441 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/40] | Title | German: | ZWEISTUFIGE DIAFILTRATIONSANORDNUNG | [2011/33] | English: | TWO STAGE DIAFILTRATION SYSTEM | [2011/33] | French: | SYSTEME DE DIAFILTRATION A DEUX ETAGES | [2011/33] |
Former [2003/40] | ZWEISTUFIGES DIAFILTRATIONSVERFAHREN UND ENTSPRECHENDE VORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2003/40] | TWO STAGE DIAFILTRATION METHOD AND APPARATUS | ||
Former [2003/40] | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE DIAFILTRATION A DEUX ETAGES | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2003 | Search fee paid | 28.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 28.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/40] | 01.09.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 04.11.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 02.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.12.2010 | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   06.11.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.02.2012 | BE | 22.02.2012 | CY | 22.02.2012 | DK | 22.02.2012 | FI | 22.02.2012 | NL | 22.02.2012 | SE | 22.02.2012 | TR | 22.02.2012 | GR | 23.05.2012 | ES | 02.06.2012 | PT | 22.06.2012 | IE | 30.10.2012 | LU | 30.10.2012 | CH | 31.10.2012 | LI | 31.10.2012 | MC | 31.10.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 22.02.2012 | |
BE | 22.02.2012 | ||
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
TR | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
ES | 02.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
IE | 30.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 22.02.2012 | |
BE | 22.02.2012 | ||
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
ES | 02.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
IE | 30.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 22.02.2012 | |
BE | 22.02.2012 | ||
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
ES | 02.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/24] | AT | 22.02.2012 | |
BE | 22.02.2012 | ||
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
ES | 02.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 22.02.2012 | |
BE | 22.02.2012 | ||
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
ES | 02.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 22.02.2012 | |
BE | 22.02.2012 | ||
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 22.02.2012 | |
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 22.02.2012 | |
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 22.02.2012 | |
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 22.02.2012 | |
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | NL | 22.02.2012 | |
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | NL | 22.02.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4469593 (ISHIHARA TOSHIKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 8,9,30 * claims 1,14 *; | [YA]US5660722 (NEDERLOF BERND [DE]) [Y] 3,5,7,9 * column 6, line 66 - column 7, line 23; figure 3 * [A] 29,30; | [A]EP0960624 (BELLCO SPA [IT]); | [XY]WO0006292 (NEPHROS INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,8,26-30 * page 11, line 9 - page 12, line 4; figure 1 * [Y] 3,5,7,9 | International search | [A]US5075003 (AOYAGI JUURO [JP]) |