EP1372950 - MULTI-LAYER SUBSTRATE FOR A PREMOISTENED WIPE CAPABLE OF CONTROLLED FLUID RELEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.08.2012 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.09.2012 [2012/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WONG, Arthur 7379 Cinnamon Woods Drive West Chester, OH 45069 / US | 02 /
FLORA, Jeffrey, Lawrence 3734 Top Flite Lane Mason, OH 45040 / US | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | Goodier, Claire-Louise, et al N.V.Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | Goodier, Claire, et al N.V.Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 B-1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 01992640.1 | 31.10.2001 | [2004/01] | WO2001US45015 | Priority number, date | US20000244955P | 01.11.2000 Original published format: US 244955 P | [2004/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0236339 | Date: | 10.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1372950 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B32B5/26, A47L13/17, D04H13/00 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
B32B5/08 (EP,US);
A47L13/17 (EP,US);
B08B1/00 (EP,US);
B08B1/143 (EP);
B32B37/0084 (US);
B32B5/022 (US);
B32B5/06 (US);
B32B5/26 (EP,US);
C11D1/825 (EP,US);
C11D17/049 (EP,US);
A47K2010/3266 (EP,US);
B32B2250/02 (US);
B32B2250/03 (US);
B32B2262/0253 (US);
B32B2262/0261 (US);
B32B2262/0284 (US);
B32B2262/062 (US);
B32B2307/728 (US);
B32B2307/73 (US);
B32B2432/00 (US);
C11D1/72 (EP,US);
C11D1/75 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2525 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2779 (EP,US);
Y10T442/60 (EP,US);
Y10T442/659 (EP,US);
Y10T442/664 (EP,US);
Y10T442/666 (EP,US);
Y10T442/668 (EP,US);
Y10T442/679 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRSCHICHTIGE UNTERLAGE MIT KONTROLLIERTER FEUCHTIGKEITSABGABE FÜR VORBEFEUCHTETE WISCHTÜCHER | [2004/01] | English: | MULTI-LAYER SUBSTRATE FOR A PREMOISTENED WIPE CAPABLE OF CONTROLLED FLUID RELEASE | [2004/01] | French: | SUBSTRAT MULTICOUCHE POUR LINGETTE HUMIDE CAPABLE D'UNE LIBERATION CONTROLEE DE LIQUIDE | [2004/01] | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.07.2002 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 02.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/36] | 18.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.11.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]US3954642 (SCHWUGER MILAN JOHANN) [DA] 18-29* column 5, line 35 - column 6, line 39; claim - *; | [X]EP0865755 (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [X] 1-17 * page 2, line 3 - line 5; claim -; tables 1,3 * * page 3, line 4 - page 4, line 2 * * page 7, line 3 - line 4 *; | [X]WO9946119 (BBA NONWOVENS SIMPSONVILLE INC [US]) [X] 1-17 * claim -; table - *; | [XY]US6028018 (AMUNDSON JOHN DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1-21,29 * column 2, line 52 - column 6, line 10; example 1; claim - * [Y] 22-24; | [Y]EP1043019 (PRODENE KLINT LAB [FR]) [Y] 22-24 * page 2, line 26 - page 3, line 11; claim - *; | [X]EP1045059 (FREUDENBERG CARL FA [DE]) [X] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO0166345 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [PX] 1-17 * page 6, paragraph 2 - page 8, line L; example -; claim - *; | [PX]WO0179599 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [PX] 1-17 * page 1, line 19 - line 21; claim - * * page 5, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4 * * page 7, line 1 - page 9, paragraph 2 * * page 12, paragraph 1 * |