EP1330414 - METHOD FOR TREATMENT OF WATER AND WASTEWATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/31] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TREATMENT OF WATER AND WASTEWATER | ||
[2010/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2011 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2020 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 23.09.2020 [2020/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Veolia Water Solutions & Technologies Support 1 Place Montgolfier Immeuble L'Aquarène 94410 Saint-Maurice / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/02] | For all designated states Veolia Water Solutions & Technologies Support 1 Place Montgolfier Immeuble L'Aquarène 94410 Saint-Maurice / FR | ||
Former [2003/31] | For all designated states OTV SA L'Aquarène, 1 place Montgolfier 94417 Saint-Maurice Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLUMENSCHEIN, Charles, D. 905 Ruth Street Pittsburgh, PA 15243 / US | 02 /
BANERJEE, Kashi 324 Indian Ridge Drive Moon Township, PA 15108 / US | [2003/31] | Representative(s) | Earnshaw, Geoffrey Mark, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [2009/48] |
Former [2003/31] | Earnshaw, Geoffrey Mark, et al Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01992688.0 | 02.11.2001 | [2003/31] | WO2001US45595 | Priority number, date | US20000245408P | 02.11.2000 Original published format: US 245408 P | [2003/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0236500 | Date: | 10.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1330414 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1330414 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/08] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1330414 | Date: | 28.09.2011 | [2011/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/52 | [2003/31] | CPC: |
C02F1/5245 (EP,US);
C02F1/52 (KR);
C02F1/38 (EP,US);
C02F2001/007 (EP,US);
C02F2101/20 (EP,US);
C02F2305/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON WASSER UND ABWASSER | [2010/31] | English: | METHOD FOR TREATMENT OF WATER AND WASTEWATER | [2010/31] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE L'EAU ET DES EAUX RESIDUAIRES | [2010/31] |
Former [2003/31] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON WASSER UND ABWASSER | ||
Former [2003/31] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TREATMENT OF WATER AND WASTEWATER | ||
Former [2003/31] | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE L'EAU ET DES EAUX RESIDUAIRES | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/31] | 05.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 17.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.12.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.02.2011 | CY | 23.02.2011 | FI | 23.02.2011 | TR | 23.02.2011 | GR | 24.05.2011 | PT | 23.06.2011 | IE | 02.11.2011 | LU | 02.11.2011 | [2020/39] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
TR | 23.02.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
IE | 02.11.2011 | ||
LU | 02.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
IE | 02.11.2011 | ||
LU | 02.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/19] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
IE | 02.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
IE | 02.11.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 23.02.2011 | |
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | SE | 23.02.2011 | |
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH02218494 ; | [A]JPS6111196 ; | [A]JPS6111193 ; | [XY]GB1398603 (ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY ENG INC, et al) [X] 1,2,7-13,18-27 * the whole document * [Y] 3-6,14-17; | [X]DE2731939 (FELDMUEHLE AG) [X] 1,18 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4675112 (VERDE LUIGI [IT]) [Y] 3-6,14-17 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901119), vol. 014, no. 526, Database accession no. (C - 0779), & JP02218494 A 19900831 (HIKARI SEIKO KK) [A] 1-27 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860605), vol. 010, no. 156, Database accession no. (C - 351), & JP61011196 A 19860118 (MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KK;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1-17 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860605), vol. 010, no. 156, Database accession no. (C - 351), & JP61011193 A 19860118 (MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KK) [A] 1-27 * abstract * | Examination | US4997573 |