EP1328776 - DEVICE FOR DETERMINING AND/OR MONITORING A PROCESS VARIABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.2016 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MC, TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Endress + Hauser GmbH + Co. KG Hauptstrasse 1 79689 Maulburg / DE | [2016/07] |
Former [2003/30] | For all designated states Endress + Hauser GmbH + Co.KG. Hauptstrasse 1 79689 Maulburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOLDT, Matthias Zeisigweg 2 79540 Lörrach / DE | 02 /
ERDMANN, Frank Schwarzwaldstrasse 456 79183 Waldkirch / DE | 03 /
PANKRATZ, Klaus Wässerleweg 6 79400 Kandern / DE | 04 /
VON STEIN, Bert Allmendweg 8 79183 Waldkirch / DE | 05 /
SPANKE, Dietmar Kandener Strasse 61 79585 Steinen / DE | [2003/30] | Representative(s) | Andres, Angelika Maria, et al Endress+Hauser Group Services (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG Colmarer Straße 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/07] | Andres, Angelika Maria, et al Endress+Hauser (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG PatServe Colmarer Strasse 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | ||
Former [2006/34] | Andres, Angelika Maria, et al Endress+Hauser (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG PatServe Colmarer Strasse 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | ||
Former [2003/30] | Andres, Angelika Endress + Hauser (Deutschland) Holding GmbH, PatServe, Patent Abteilung, Colmarer Strasse 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 01992873.8 | 20.10.2001 | [2003/30] | WO2001EP12152 | Priority number, date | DE20001052836 | 24.10.2000 Original published format: DE 10052836 | [2003/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0237061 | Date: | 10.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1328776 | Date: | 23.07.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1328776 | Date: | 17.02.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01D9/00, G01F23/18, G01F23/284 | [2015/41] | CPC: |
G01F23/284 (EP,US);
G01D9/005 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/30] | G01D9/00, G01F23/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2016/07] |
Former [2003/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG UND/ODER ÜBERWACHUNG EINER PROZESSVARIABLEN | [2003/30] | English: | DEVICE FOR DETERMINING AND/OR MONITORING A PROCESS VARIABLE | [2003/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR DETERMINER ET/OU SURVEILLER UNE VARIABLE DE PROCESSUS | [2003/30] | Entry into regional phase | 05.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 05.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/30] | 06.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.07.2007 | Opposition(s) | 18.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 17.02.2016 | DK | 17.02.2016 | ES | 17.02.2016 | FI | 17.02.2016 | MC | 17.02.2016 | NL | 17.02.2016 | SE | 17.02.2016 | TR | 17.02.2016 | GR | 18.05.2016 | PT | 17.06.2016 | AT | 20.10.2016 | IE | 20.10.2016 | LU | 20.10.2016 | BE | 31.10.2016 | CH | 31.10.2016 | LI | 31.10.2016 | [2018/29] |
Former [2018/10] | DK | 17.02.2016 | |
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
AT | 20.10.2016 | ||
IE | 20.10.2016 | ||
LU | 20.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | DK | 17.02.2016 | |
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
IE | 20.10.2016 | ||
LU | 20.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/43] | DK | 17.02.2016 | |
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
LU | 20.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/12] | DK | 17.02.2016 | |
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | DK | 17.02.2016 | |
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | ES | 17.02.2016 | |
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | ES | 17.02.2016 | |
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/37] | ES | 17.02.2016 | |
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 17.02.2016 | |
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0346685 (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,8,10,11 * abstract * * column 7, line 17 - line 25 * [Y] 12,13; | [XY]GB2296971 (ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY UK [GB]) [X] 1,4 * abstract * [Y] 12,13; | [XY]GB2342453 (ABB INSTRUMENTATION LTD [GB]) [X] 1-3,6,7,9 * abstract * [Y] 12,13; | [Y]DE19860901 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 12,13* abstract *; | [XY]US6122959 (HOSHAL GREGORY D [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9,10 * column 3, line 2 - column 4, line 56; figure - * * column 6, line 61 - line 65 * [Y] 12,13 |