EP1439859 - AN ANTINEOPLASTIC- DENDRITIC POLYMER DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dendritic Nanotechnologies Inc. 2625 Denison Drive, Suite B Mt. Pleasant, MI 48858 / US | [2007/16] |
Former [2005/33] | For all designated states Dendritic Nanotechnologies Inc. 2625 Denison Drive, Suite B Mt. Pleasant, MI 48858 / US | ||
Former [2004/31] | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MALIK, Navid 1 Lynton Road Kilburn London NW6 6BD / GB | 02 /
DUNCAN, Ruth 143B Chiltern Court London NW1 1AX / GB | 03 /
TOMALIA, Donald, A. 463 West Chippewa River Road Midland, MI 48640 / US | 04 /
ESFAND, Roseita 2542 Cleary Court Mississauga Ontario LSKIY3 / CA | [2004/48] |
Former [2004/31] | 01 /
MALIK, Navid 1 Lynton Road Kilburn London NW6 6BD / GB | ||
02 /
DUNCAN, Ruth 143B Chiltern Court London NW1 1AX / GB | |||
03 /
TOMALIA, Donald, A. 463 West Chippewa River Road Midland, MI 48640 / US | |||
04 /
ESFAND, Roseita 1206 Glenwood Mt. Pleasant, MI 48858 / US | Representative(s) | Raynor, John, et al Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/31] | Raynor, John, et al W.H. Beck, Greener & Co 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01993291.2 | 29.10.2001 | [2004/31] | WO2001US48568 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03037383 | Date: | 08.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1439859 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1439859 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/48 | [2004/31] | CPC: |
A61K47/595 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABGABESYSTEM FÜR ANTINEOPLASTISCHE ARZNEISTOFFE AUF BASIS DENDRITISCHER POLYMERE | [2004/31] | English: | AN ANTINEOPLASTIC- DENDRITIC POLYMER DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEM | [2004/31] | French: | SYSTEME D'ADMINISTRATION D'UN MEDICAMENT CONTENANT UN DENDRIMERE ANTINEOPLASIQUE | [2004/31] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/31] | 10.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.04.2007 | BE | 18.04.2007 | CY | 18.04.2007 | DK | 18.04.2007 | FI | 18.04.2007 | IT | 18.04.2007 | NL | 18.04.2007 | TR | 18.04.2007 | SE | 18.07.2007 | GR | 19.07.2007 | ES | 29.07.2007 | PT | 18.09.2007 | LU | 29.10.2007 | IE | 30.10.2007 | MC | 31.10.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
BE | 18.04.2007 | ||
CY | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
IT | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
LU | 29.10.2007 | ||
IE | 30.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
BE | 18.04.2007 | ||
CY | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
IT | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
IE | 30.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
BE | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
IT | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
IE | 30.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/26] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
BE | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
IT | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
BE | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
IT | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
BE | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
BE | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
BE | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
BE | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | FI | 18.04.2007 | |
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | ES | 29.07.2007 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0928813 (DOW CORNING [US]) [Y] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [XY]WO0107469 (VERDINI ANTONIO [IT]) [X] 1,7,10-12,14,15,18,20-22 * claims 1,25,28,33-38,43,46,47 * [Y] 1-25; | [Y]EP1118333 (EURAND INT [IT]) [Y] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [X] - CHIE KOJIMA, KENJI KONO, KAZUO MARUYAMA, AND TORU TAKGISHI, "Synthesis of Polyamidoamine Dendrimers Having Poly(ethylene glycol) Grafts and Their Ability To Encapsulate Anticancer Drugs", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, (200011), vol. 11, no. 6, pages 910 - 917, XP002201126 [X] 1,7,10-15,18-24 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc0000583 | [Y] - UHRICH K, "Hyperbranched Polymers for Drug Delivery", TRENDS IN POLYMER SCIENCE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19971201), vol. 5, no. 12, ISSN 0966-4793, pages 388 - 393, XP004098786 [Y] 1-25 * page 391, column L, paragraph DRUGDELIVERY * | [Y] - JANSEN J F G A ET AL, "ENCAPSULATION OF GUEST MOLECULES INTO A DENDRITIC BOX", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE,, US, (19941118), vol. 266, no. 5188, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 1226 - 1229, XP000500113 [Y] 1-25 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.266.5188.1226 |