EP1373881 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR IMPROVING THE DYNAMIC RANGE OF LASER DETECTED ULTRASONIC IN ATTENUATIVE MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2016 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.09.2016 [2016/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lockheed Martin Corporation 6801 Rockledge Drive Bethesda, MD 20817 / US | [2004/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DRAKE, Thomas, E., Jr. 2530 Ryan Place Drive Fort Worth, TX 76110 / US | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | Kay, Ross Marcel, et al Laudens Blackwell House Guildhall Yard London EC2V 5AE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/41] | Kay, Ross Marcel, et al Laudens Blackwell House Guildhall Yard London EC2V 5AE / GB | ||
Former [2008/26] | Kay, Ross Marcel, et al Laudens Blackwell House Guildhall Yard London EC2V 5AE / GB | ||
Former [2004/20] | Lawrence, Malcolm Graham, et al Hepworth, Lawrence, Bryer & Bizley Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | ||
Former [2004/01] | Kay, Ross Marcel, et al Hepworth Lawrence Bryer & Bizley, Merlin House, Falconry Court, Bakers Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01993357.1 | 19.12.2001 | [2004/01] | WO2001US51036 | Priority number, date | US20010766180 | 19.01.2001 Original published format: US 766180 | [2004/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02057769 | Date: | 25.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1373881 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1373881 | Date: | 07.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01N29/24 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
G01N29/341 (EP,US);
G01N29/223 (EP,US);
G01N29/2418 (EP,US);
G01N29/32 (EP,US);
G01N2291/015 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2015/41] |
Former [2004/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | METHODE UND GERÄT ZUR ERHÖHUNG DES RAUSCHABSTANDES VON LASERDETEKTIERTEM ULTRASCHALL IN DÄMPFENDEN MATERIALIEN | [2004/01] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR IMPROVING THE DYNAMIC RANGE OF LASER DETECTED ULTRASONIC IN ATTENUATIVE MATERIALS | [2004/01] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT D'AMELIORER LE DOMAINE DYNAMIQUE D'ULTRASONS DETECTES PAR LASER DANS DES MATERIAUX ATTENUATEURS | [2004/01] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.07.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 20.02.2008 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 30.04.2008 | Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art | 08.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 07.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.10.2008 | Opposition(s) | 08.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/37] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 07.05.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 01.06.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.06.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2656478 (SODENA [FR]) [A] 1,2,19,24,25 * abstract ** page 6, line 30 - page 8, line 25; figure 1 *; | [X]US5672830 (ROGERS JOHN A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,19 * abstract * * column 4, line 16 - column 5, line 24 * * column 9, line 15 - line 20; figure 1 * |