EP1335813 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MACHINING THE SURFACES OF OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.04.2009 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2014 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 19.11.2014 [2014/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Prikhodko, Dr., Sergey Ennetbürger Strasse 10 6374 Buochs / CH | [2006/18] |
Former [2005/03] | For all designated states Prikhodko, Dr., Sergey Charlottenburger Strasse 89 13086 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2003/34] | For all designated states KMM Oberflächentechnik GmbH Pankstr. 8-10/C 13127 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRIKHODKO, Sergey, Dr. Ennetbürger Str. 10 6374 Buochs / CH | 02 /
WOLF, Reinhard Langhansstr. 3a 13086 Berlin / DE | [2007/42] |
Former [2005/03] | 01 /
PRIKHODKO, Sergey, Dr. Charlottenburger Strasse 89 13086 Berlin / DE | ||
02 /
WOLF, Reinhard Langhansstr. 3a 13086 Berlin / DE | |||
Former [2003/34] | 01 /
PRIKHODKO, Serquei St. Panfilovzev 656057 Barnaul / RU | ||
02 /
WOLF, Reinhard Langhansstr. 3a 13086 Berlin / DE | Representative(s) | Hengelhaupt, Jürgen, et al Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/34] | Hengelhaupt, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Schützenstrasse 15-17 10117 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 01993526.1 | 08.11.2001 | [2003/34] | WO2001EP12952 | Priority number, date | DE2000155382 | 08.11.2000 Original published format: DE 10055382 | [2003/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0238334 | Date: | 16.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1335813 | Date: | 20.08.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1335813 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B24B31/10, B24B1/00 | [2003/34] | CPC: |
B24B1/005 (EP);
B24B31/102 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDLUNG VON GEGENSTÄNDEN | [2003/34] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MACHINING THE SURFACES OF OBJECTS | [2003/34] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE SURFACE D'OBJETS | [2003/34] | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/35] | 24.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Appeal following examination | 02.04.2008 | Appeal received | 02.04.2008 | Statement of grounds filed | 29.04.2008 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | Opposition(s) | 05.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 04.06.2008 | DK | 04.06.2008 | FI | 04.06.2008 | IE | 04.06.2008 | IT | 04.06.2008 | NL | 04.06.2008 | TR | 04.06.2008 | SE | 16.07.2008 | GR | 17.07.2008 | ES | 27.07.2008 | PT | 16.09.2008 | AT | 08.11.2008 | GB | 08.11.2008 | LU | 08.11.2008 | BE | 30.11.2008 | MC | 30.11.2008 | FR | 01.12.2008 | [2014/47] |
Former [2011/47] | CY | 04.06.2008 | |
DK | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
IE | 04.06.2008 | ||
IT | 04.06.2008 | ||
NL | 04.06.2008 | ||
TR | 04.06.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
GR | 17.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
AT | 08.11.2008 | ||
GB | 08.11.2008 | ||
LU | 08.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
FR | 01.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/47] | CY | 04.06.2008 | |
DK | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
IE | 04.06.2008 | ||
IT | 04.06.2008 | ||
NL | 04.06.2008 | ||
TR | 04.06.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
GR | 17.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
AT | 08.11.2008 | ||
GB | 08.11.2008 | ||
LU | 08.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/37] | CY | 04.06.2008 | |
DK | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
IE | 04.06.2008 | ||
IT | 04.06.2008 | ||
NL | 04.06.2008 | ||
TR | 04.06.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
AT | 08.11.2008 | ||
GB | 08.11.2008 | ||
LU | 08.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | CY | 04.06.2008 | |
DK | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
IE | 04.06.2008 | ||
IT | 04.06.2008 | ||
NL | 04.06.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
AT | 08.11.2008 | ||
GB | 08.11.2008 | ||
LU | 08.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | DK | 04.06.2008 | |
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
IE | 04.06.2008 | ||
IT | 04.06.2008 | ||
NL | 04.06.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
AT | 08.11.2008 | ||
GB | 08.11.2008 | ||
LU | 08.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/11] | DK | 04.06.2008 | |
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
IE | 04.06.2008 | ||
IT | 04.06.2008 | ||
NL | 04.06.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
AT | 08.11.2008 | ||
GB | 08.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/08] | DK | 04.06.2008 | |
IE | 04.06.2008 | ||
IT | 04.06.2008 | ||
NL | 04.06.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
AT | 08.11.2008 | ||
GB | 08.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/01] | DK | 04.06.2008 | |
IE | 04.06.2008 | ||
IT | 04.06.2008 | ||
NL | 04.06.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
GB | 08.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/49] | DK | 04.06.2008 | |
IE | 04.06.2008 | ||
IT | 04.06.2008 | ||
NL | 04.06.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/43] | DK | 04.06.2008 | |
IE | 04.06.2008 | ||
IT | 04.06.2008 | ||
NL | 04.06.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | DK | 04.06.2008 | |
IE | 04.06.2008 | ||
IT | 04.06.2008 | ||
NL | 04.06.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | DK | 04.06.2008 | |
IE | 04.06.2008 | ||
NL | 04.06.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | DK | 04.06.2008 | |
IE | 04.06.2008 | ||
NL | 04.06.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | IE | 04.06.2008 | |
NL | 04.06.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | NL | 04.06.2008 | |
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/01] | NL | 04.06.2008 | |
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | ES | 27.07.2008 | |
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/47] | ES | 27.07.2008 | Cited in | International search | [DA]SU500044 (KHAIRULLIN KH) [DA] 1-9 * abstract *; | [AD]DE2826554 (FIZ TECH I AKAD NAUK) [AD] 1-9 * page 6, paragraph 2 - page 9, paragraph 1 * * page 9, paragraph 3 * * page 14, paragraph 1 - page 19, paragraph 1 ** figure 2 *; | [DA]US4730418 (SUGAWARA SHUICHI [JP], et al) [DA] 1-9 * column 3, line 32 - column 6, line 65 * * figures 3-7 * |