EP1332027 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SHAPED PART [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Munksjö Paper GmbH Waldhaeuser Strasse 41 73432 Aalen / DE | [2006/15] |
Former [2003/32] | For all designated states Munksjoe Paper Decor GmbH & Co. KG Waldhaeuser Strasse 41 73432 Aalen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RATHGEB, Erich Milanweg 99 73434 Aalen / DE | [2003/32] | Representative(s) | Meyer-Roedern, Giso Bergheimer Strasse 10-12 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/32] | Meyer-Roedern, Giso, Dr. Bergheimer Strasse 10-12 69115 Heidelberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 01993530.3 | 13.10.2001 | [2003/32] | WO2001DE03934 | Priority number, date | DE2000219180U | 10.11.2000 Original published format: DE 20019180 U | [2003/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0238345 | Date: | 16.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1332027 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1332027 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B27N3/06 | [2003/32] | CPC: |
D21H27/26 (EP,US);
B44C1/24 (EP,US);
B44C5/0469 (EP,US);
D21H11/12 (EP,US);
D21H17/49 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1028 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES FORMTEILS | [2003/32] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SHAPED PART | [2003/32] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UNE PIECE MOULEE | [2003/32] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/32] | 23.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 18.03.2009 | DK | 18.03.2009 | FI | 18.03.2009 | IE | 18.03.2009 | SE | 18.06.2009 | GR | 19.06.2009 | PT | 26.08.2009 | LU | 13.10.2009 | MC | 31.10.2009 | [2011/45] |
Former [2011/21] | DK | 18.03.2009 | |
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
IE | 18.03.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
GR | 19.06.2009 | ||
PT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LU | 13.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | DK | 18.03.2009 | |
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
IE | 18.03.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
GR | 19.06.2009 | ||
PT | 26.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | DK | 18.03.2009 | |
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
IE | 18.03.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 26.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | DK | 18.03.2009 | |
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
IE | 18.03.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 26.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | FI | 18.03.2009 | |
IE | 18.03.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 26.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | FI | 18.03.2009 | |
IE | 18.03.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/37] | FI | 18.03.2009 | |
SE | 18.06.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3514353 (SHAINES ALFRED) [X] 1,2,7,10,11 * column 2, line 34 - line 37; claim 11 *; | [A]DE2426518 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]US4045262 (ENZINGER HANS JOACHIM, et al) [A] 1* example 1 *; | [PX]DE20019180U (MUNKSJOE PAPER DECOR GMBH & CO [DE]) [PX] 1-11 * the whole document * |