EP1348012 - IMPROVED HYDROPROCESSING PROCESS AND METHOD OF RETROFITTING EXISTING HYDROPROCESSING REACTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Haldor Topsøe A/S Nymøllevej 55 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2003/40] | For all designated states Haldor Topsoe A/S Nymollevej 55 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WRISBERG, Johannes Graesdammen 25 DK-2840 Holte / DK | 02 /
SORENSEN, Arno, Sten Hulso Ege 3 DK-2960 Rungstedt Kyst / DK | [2009/42] |
Former [2003/40] | 01 /
WRISBERG, Johannes Graesdammen 25 DK-2840 Holte / DK | ||
02 /
S RENSEN, Arno, Sten Huls Ege 3 DK-2960 Rungstedt Kyst / DK | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/26] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/40] | Grünecker, August, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01993661.6 | 08.11.2001 | [2003/40] | WO2001EP12949 | Priority number, date | DK20000001691 | 11.11.2000 Original published format: DK 200001691 | [2003/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0238704 | Date: | 16.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1348012 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1348012 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C10G65/10 | [2003/40] | CPC: |
C10G49/00 (EP,US);
C10G65/10 (EP,KR,US);
C10G49/002 (EP,US);
C10G65/12 (EP,US);
C10G2300/202 (EP,US);
C10G2300/207 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTES HYDROPROCESSING-VERFAHREN UND VERFAHREN ZUR UMRÜSTUNG BESTEHENDER HYDROPROCESSING-REAKTOREN | [2003/40] | English: | IMPROVED HYDROPROCESSING PROCESS AND METHOD OF RETROFITTING EXISTING HYDROPROCESSING REACTORS | [2003/40] | French: | PROCESSUS DE HYDROCRAQUAGE ET PROCEDE DE MONTAGE PAR RATTRAPAGE DES REACTEURS D'HYDROCRAQUAGE EXISTANTS | [2003/40] | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.05.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/40] | 06.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04020687.2 / EP1482023 | Opposition(s) | 20.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.03.2010 | BE | 17.03.2010 | CY | 17.03.2010 | DK | 17.03.2010 | FI | 17.03.2010 | IT | 17.03.2010 | NL | 17.03.2010 | SE | 17.03.2010 | TR | 17.03.2010 | GR | 18.06.2010 | ES | 28.06.2010 | PT | 19.07.2010 | IE | 08.11.2010 | LU | 08.11.2010 | CH | 30.11.2010 | FR | 30.11.2010 | LI | 30.11.2010 | MC | 30.11.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IT | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
IE | 08.11.2010 | ||
LU | 08.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
FR | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IT | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
IE | 08.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
FR | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IT | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IT | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IT | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/37] | AT | 17.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [XY]GB1193212 (ATLANTIC RICHFIELD CO [US]) [X] 1,2 * figure 1; claim 1 * [Y] 1,5; | [Y]US3983029 (WHITE ROBERT J) [Y] 1,5 * column 7, line 4 - line 30; figure 2 *; | [X]US4058449 (REITZ ORTWIN, et al) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 23 - column 4, line 45; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0234123 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [A] 6-10* page 4, line 41 - page 5, line 52; figures 7-9; claims 1,2 *; | [X]EP0354623 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [X] 1,2 * page 2, line 3 - line 24 * * page 3, line 2 - line 8; figure 1; claims 1,6 *; | [X]US5968346 (JUNG HENRY [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * figure 1 * |