EP1364326 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR COMPUTER-IMPLEMENTED TRADING OF NEW ISSUE AND SECONDARY MARKET DEBT SECURITIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.09.2009 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MarketAxess Holdings Inc. 140 Broadway, 42nd Floor New York NY 10005 / US | [2006/25] |
Former [2003/48] | For all designated states Market Axess Inc. 140 Broadway, 42nd Floor New York, NY 10005 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AGARWAL, Brijesh 39 Woodland Avenue Glen Ridge, NJ 07028 / US | 02 /
MOSELEY, Rachel One Berwick Road Scarsdale, NY 10583 / US | 03 /
SCHIFFMAN, Richard, J. 123 Serpentine Road Tenafly, NJ 07670 / US | [2003/48] | Representative(s) | Hackett, Sean James Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/48] | Hackett, Sean James Marks & Clerk, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 01994310.9 | 24.12.2001 | [2003/48] | WO2001US49290 | Priority number, date | US20000257807P | 22.12.2000 Original published format: US 257807 P | [2003/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02057871 | Date: | 25.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1364326 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.02.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2003/48] | CPC: |
G06Q40/04 (EP,US);
G06Q20/10 (EP,US);
G06Q40/00 (EP,US);
G06Q40/06 (EP,US);
G06Q40/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/48] | Extension states | AL | 22.07.2003 | LT | 22.07.2003 | LV | 22.07.2003 | MK | 22.07.2003 | RO | 22.07.2003 | SI | 22.07.2003 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM FÜR DEN COMPUTERIMPLEMENTIERTEN HANDEL MIT NEU AUSGEGEBENEN UND SEKUNDÄREN MARKTSCHULDWERTPAPIEREN | [2003/48] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR COMPUTER-IMPLEMENTED TRADING OF NEW ISSUE AND SECONDARY MARKET DEBT SECURITIES | [2003/48] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE COMMERCIALISATION INFORMATISEE DE NOUVELLES EMISSIONS ET TITRES D'EMPRUNT DE MARCHE SECONDAIRE | [2003/48] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2003 | Search fee paid | 01.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/48] | 27.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 02.06.2009 | 14.05.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 27.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/42] | 02.06.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.06.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 06.06.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2008 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   26.02.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search | International search | [Y]US5915209 (LAWRENCE DAVID [US]); | [Y]US6029146 (HAWKINS JOHN G [US], et al) |