EP1345960 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS INVOLVING AN ESSENTIAL STAPHYLOCOCCUS AUREUS GENE AND ITS ENCODED PROTEIN STAAU-R4 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.11.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Targanta Therapeutics Inc. C.P. 387 Place du Parc Montreal, Quebec H2W 2N9 / CA | [2005/17] |
Former [2003/39] | For all designated states Phagetech Inc. C.P. 387 Place du Parc Montreal, Quebec H2W 2N9 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PELLETIER, Jerry 8 Lakeview Baie D'Urfe, Quebec H9X 3B1 / CA | 02 /
GROS, Philippe 107 Montrose St. Lambert, Quebec J4R 1X4 / CA | 03 /
DUBOW, Michael 36 rue Albert Camus F-92160 Anthony / FR | [2003/39] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/39] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Steinsdorfstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01994577.3 | 19.12.2001 | [2003/39] | WO2001CA01847 | Priority number, date | US20000256489P | 20.12.2000 Original published format: US 256489 P | [2003/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0250106 | Date: | 27.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1345960 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/31, C12N15/31, G01N33/68, A61K38/00, A61P31/00, C12Q1/68, C07K16/12 | [2003/39] | CPC: |
C07K14/31 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSTZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN MIT EINEM ESSENTIELLEN STAPHYLOCOCCUS AUREUS GEN UND KODIERTES PROTEIN STAAU-R4 | [2003/39] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS INVOLVING AN ESSENTIAL STAPHYLOCOCCUS AUREUS GENE AND ITS ENCODED PROTEIN STAAU-R4 | [2003/39] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET METHODES METTANT EN OEUVRE UN GENE ESSENTIEL DE STAPHYLOCOCCUS AUREUS ET PROTEINE CODEE STAAU R4 ASSOCIEE | [2003/39] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/39] | 27.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/01] | 07.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X] - MORBIDONI H R ET AL, "Bacillus subtilis acyl carrier protein is encoded in a cluster of lipid biosynthesis genes", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (199608), vol. 178, no. 16, ISSN 0021-9193, pages 4794 - 4800, XP002119514 [X] 2,5-8,10,13 * abstract * * page 4794, column R, paragraph L * * page 4795, column R, paragraph 2 - page 4796, column L, paragraph 1; figures 1,2 * * page 4799, column L, paragraph 3 * | [PX] - MAKOTO KURODA ET AL., "Whole genome sequencing of meticillin-resistant Staphylococcus aureus", LANCET, (200104), vol. 357, pages 1225 - 1240, XP004246103 [PX] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(00)04403-2 | [PX] - KURODA, M. ET AL., "Staphylococcus aureus subsp. aureus genomic DNA, complete genome, section 5/10", EMBL, (20010424), Database accession no. AP003133, XP002215850 [PX] 1-13 * nucleotides 16851-17837 * | Examination | WO0032825 | - JING LIU ET AL., "Antimicrobial drug discovery through bacteriophage genomics", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (200402), vol. 22, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1038/nbt932, pages 185 - 191, XP002318262 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt932 |