EP1366198 - SEPARATION PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.12.2012 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.01.2013 [2013/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DuPont Nutrition Biosciences ApS Langebrogade 1 Postboks 17 1001 Copenhagen K. / DK | [2012/32] |
Former [2009/08] | For all designated states Danisco A/S Langebrogade 1 PO Box 17 1001 Copenhagen K / DK | ||
Former [2003/49] | For all designated states Danisco Sweeteners Oy Keilaranta 9 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEIKKILÄ, Heikki Ristiniementie 32 G 33 FIN-02320 Espoo / FI | 02 /
MÄNTTÄRI, Mika Humalniementie 35 FIN-53100 Lappeenranta / FI | 03 /
NYSTRÖM, Marianne Harjukatu 27 FIN-53300 Lappeenranta / FI | 04 /
LINDROOS, Mirja Pohjoispiha 8 FIN-02400 Kirkkonummi / FI | 05 /
PAANANEN, Hannu Niittypolku 14 FIN-02460 Kantvik / FI | 06 /
PUUPPO, Outi Mellstenintie 17 B 13 FIN-02170 Espoo / FI | 07 /
KOIVIKKO, Hannu Kolsarintie 4 FIN-02460 Kantvik / FI | [2003/49] | Representative(s) | Puranen, Maija-Liisa Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | [2012/06] |
Former [2003/49] | Puranen, Maija-Liisa Kolster Oy Ab, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 01994869.4 | 28.12.2001 | [2003/49] | WO2001FI01155 | Priority number, date | FI20000002865 | 28.12.2000 Original published format: FI 20002865 | FI20000002866 | 28.12.2000 Original published format: FI 20002866 | [2003/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02053781 | Date: | 11.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1366198 | Date: | 03.12.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1366198 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 11.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C13K1/00, C13K13/00, C13B20/16 | [2011/20] | CPC: |
C13B20/165 (EP,US);
C07H1/06 (KR);
C13K13/002 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/49] | C13K1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/49] | Title | German: | TRENNVERFAHREN | [2003/49] | English: | SEPARATION PROCESS | [2003/49] | French: | PROCEDE DE SEPARATION | [2003/49] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 22.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/49] | 18.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.03.2005 | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 08.02.2012 | CY | 08.02.2012 | FI | 08.02.2012 | GR | 09.05.2012 | [2012/41] |
Former [2012/37] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | GR | 09.05.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9928490 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) |