EP1377438 - PREPARATION OF NANOCRYSTALLITES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Massachusetts Institute of Technology 77 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02142-1324 / US | [2012/33] |
Former [2004/02] | For all designated states Massachussets Institute of Technology 77 Massachussets Avenue Cambridge, MA 02142-1324 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAWENDI, Moungi, G. 263 Commonwealth Avenue 5 Boston, MA 02116 / US | 02 /
STOTT, Nathan E. 290 Vassar Street Apt. E-2 Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2012/33] |
Former [2004/02] | 01 /
BAWENDI, Moungi, G. 263 Commonwealth Avenue 5 Boston, MA 02116 / US | ||
02 /
STOTT, Nathan E. 290 Vassar Street, Apt. E-2 Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | Representative(s) | Mallalieu, Catherine Louise, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/33] | Mallalieu, Catherine Louise, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2004/02] | Mallalieu, Catherine Louise, et al D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01995322.3 | 06.12.2001 | [2004/02] | WO2001US45815 | Priority number, date | US20000732013 | 08.12.2000 Original published format: US 732013 | [2004/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0247117 | Date: | 13.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1377438 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1377438 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.09.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B32B5/16, C01F1/00, C01G9/00, C01G28/00, C30B7/14, C30B29/48, C30B29/40, C30B29/60, C01B19/00, C01B17/20, B82Y30/00 | [2012/11] | CPC: |
C01B17/20 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C01B19/007 (EP,US);
C30B29/40 (EP,US);
C30B29/48 (EP,US);
C30B29/605 (EP,US);
C30B7/00 (EP,US);
C30B7/14 (EP,US);
C01P2004/64 (EP,US);
H01L33/005 (EP,US);
H01L33/0083 (EP,US);
Y10S516/922 (EP,US);
Y10S977/813 (EP,US);
Y10S977/815 (EP,US);
Y10S977/818 (EP,US);
Y10S977/819 (EP,US);
Y10S977/82 (EP,US);
Y10S977/822 (EP,US);
Y10S977/823 (EP,US);
Y10S977/824 (EP,US);
Y10S977/916 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2991 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C30B7/00, C30B29/605 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/02] | B32B5/16, C01F1/00, C01G9/00, C01G28/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/02] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON NANOKRISTALLEN | [2004/02] | English: | PREPARATION OF NANOCRYSTALLITES | [2004/02] | French: | PREPARATION DE NANOCRISTALLITES | [2004/02] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2003 | Search fee paid | 01.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 01.07.2003 | Examination requested [2004/02] | 22.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 06.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11182379.5 / EP2399733 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.08.2012 | BE | 15.08.2012 | CY | 15.08.2012 | DK | 15.08.2012 | FI | 15.08.2012 | IT | 15.08.2012 | NL | 15.08.2012 | SE | 15.08.2012 | TR | 15.08.2012 | GR | 16.11.2012 | ES | 26.11.2012 | IE | 06.12.2012 | LU | 06.12.2012 | PT | 17.12.2012 | CH | 31.12.2012 | LI | 31.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | FR | 02.01.2013 | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
TR | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IE | 06.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
FR | 02.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IE | 06.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
FR | 02.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IE | 06.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IE | 06.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 15.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5505928 (ALIVISATOS A PAUL [US], et al) [X] 24,26* column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 67 *; | [E]WO0234757 (OXONICA LTD [GB], et al) [E] 22 * page 5, lines 21-24 * * page 9, lines 18-21; claim 1 *; | [PA] - CHEN ET AL, "A facile and novel way for the synthesis of nearly monodisperse silver nanoparticles", MATERIALS RESEARCH BULLETIN, ELSEVIER, KIDLINGTON, GB, (20070619), vol. 42, no. 9, ISSN 0025-5408, pages 1657 - 1661, XP022122255 [PA] 22 * page 1658, lines 10,11 * * page 1660, lines 17-19 * | International search | [X]US5505928 (ALIVISATOS A PAUL [US], et al); | [X]US6179912 (BARBERA-GUILLEM EMILIO [US], et al); | [XE]WO0107689 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al); | [X]US6262129 (MURRAY CHRISTOPHER BRUCE [US], et al) |