EP1346140 - ACTUATOR REGULATION AND CORRESPONDING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.2006 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.08.2006 [2006/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/39] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARANOWSKI, Dirk Herzog-Heinrich-Str. 8 93059 Regensburg / DE | 02 /
HOFFMANN, Christian Am Nordheim 5 93057 Regensburg / DE | 03 /
PIRKL, Richard Erhardigasse 13 93047 Regensburg / DE | 04 /
BOCK, Wolfgang Hedwig-Dransfeld-Weg 5 93055 Regensburg / DE | [2003/39] | Application number, filing date | 01995610.1 | 17.12.2001 | [2003/39] | WO2001DE04742 | Priority number, date | DE2000163080 | 18.12.2000 Original published format: DE 10063080 | [2003/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0250413 | Date: | 27.06.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1346140 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1346140 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/20, H01L41/04 | [2003/39] | CPC: |
F02D41/2096 (EP,US);
H10N30/802 (EP,US);
H02N2/062 (EP,US);
F02D2041/2051 (EP,US);
F02D2200/023 (EP,US);
F02D2200/0606 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2004/20] |
Former [2003/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | AKTORSTEUERUNG UND ZUGEHÖRIGES VERFAHREN | [2003/39] | English: | ACTUATOR REGULATION AND CORRESPONDING METHOD | [2003/39] | French: | REGULATION D'ACTIONNEUR ET PROCEDE ASSOCIE | [2003/39] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/39] | 12.08.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]DE19652801 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [DA] 1,8 * column W *; | [DA]DE19652809 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [DA] 1,8* column W *; | [DA]DE19723932 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [DA] 1,8 * column W *; | [XY]DE19805184 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,6,8,13 * column A * * column 7, line 26 - line 55 * * column 8, line 19 - line 23 * [Y] 4,11; | [Y]WO0019549 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [Y] 4,11 * page 9, line 6 - line 12 * * claims 1,16 *; | [X]DE19848950 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,6,8,13 * column A * * column 1, line 39 - line 52 * * claims 1,3 * | by applicant | DE19652801 | DE19652809 | DE19723932 |