EP1355980 - PLASTICIZER-CONTAINING POLYVINYLBUTYRALS, METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME AND THE USE THEREOF, ESPECIALLY FOR PRODUCING FILMS FOR USE IN LAMINATED SAFETY GLASSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.2010 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.11.2010 [2010/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kuraray Europe GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2007/09] |
Former [2003/44] | For all designated states Kuraray Specialities Europe GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAPENFUHS, Bernd Rembruecker Weg 6A 63179 Obertshausen / DE | 02 /
STEUER, Martin Platanenweg 18 65835 Liederbach / DE | [2003/44] | Representative(s) | Kisters, Michael Marcus, et al Kuraray Europe GmbH Patents and Trademarks Mülheimer Strasse 26 53840 Troisdorf / DE | [2007/09] |
Former [2005/28] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2003/44] | Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner Patentanwälte, John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 01995713.3 | 22.12.2001 | [2003/44] | WO2001EP15302 | Priority number, date | DE2001100681 | 09.01.2001 Original published format: DE 10100681 | [2003/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02055595 | Date: | 18.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1355980 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/103, C08L29/14, C08J5/18, B32B17/10 | [2003/44] | CPC: |
B32B17/10761 (EP,US);
C08K5/103 (EP,KR,US);
B32B17/10605 (EP,US);
Y10T428/252 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/103, C08L29/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/44] | Title | German: | WEICHMACHERHALTIGE POLYVINYLBUTYRALE, VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG SOWIE DEREN VERWENDUNG, INSBESONDERE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FOLIEN ZUM EINSATZ IN VERBUNDSICHERHEITSGLÄSERN | [2003/44] | English: | PLASTICIZER-CONTAINING POLYVINYLBUTYRALS, METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME AND THE USE THEREOF, ESPECIALLY FOR PRODUCING FILMS FOR USE IN LAMINATED SAFETY GLASSES | [2003/44] | French: | POLY(BUTYRALS DE VINYLE) RENFERMANT UN PLASTIFIANT, LEUR PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION ET LEUR UTILISATION, NOTAMMENT DANS LA PRODUCTION DE FILMS UTILISES DANS DES VERRES DE SECURITE FEUILLETES | [2003/44] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.05.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/44] | 05.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/45] | 23.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]DE2820780 (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG) [DX] 1-11* example 5; claim - *; | [PX]EP1104783 (DUNLOP TECH GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1-5,7-10 * paragraphs [0019] - [0024]; claim - * |