EP1350269 - SELF-PASSIVATING CU LASER FUSE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2009 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.04.2009 [2009/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | [2008/30] |
Former [2008/23] | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St Martin Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/41] | For all designated states Infineon Technologies North America Corp. 1730 North First Street San Jose, CA 95112-4508 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARTH, Hans Joachim lUETZOWSTR. 19a 81245 Muenchen / DE | [2003/41] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schlossschmidstrasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/41] | Epping Hermann & Fischer Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01995904.8 | 14.11.2001 | [2003/41] | WO2001US43902 | Priority number, date | US20000751554 | 28.12.2000 Original published format: US 751554 | [2003/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02054486 | Date: | 11.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1350269 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1350269 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/17] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1350269 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | [2008/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/525 | [2003/41] | CPC: |
H01L23/5258 (EP,US);
H01L21/82 (KR);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/20] |
Former [2003/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | SELBSTPASSIVIERENDE LASERSICHERUNG AUS KUPFER | [2003/41] | English: | SELF-PASSIVATING CU LASER FUSE | [2003/41] | French: | FUSIBLE LASER EN CUIVRE A AUTOPASSIVATION | [2003/41] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/41] | 06.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1032040 (IBM [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 5, line 39 - column 8, line 10; figures 4A-D *; | [A]EP1049164 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 7, line 14 - column 8, line 58; figures 2A-F *; | [DA]US6057223 (LANFORD WILLIAM A [US], et al) [DA] 1,8 * column 5, line 1 - column 6, line 20; figure 4 * |