EP1346001 - TWO-COMPONENT COATING COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING SILANE ADHESION PROMOTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2013 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER CORPORATION 100 Bayer Road Pittsburgh, PA 15205-9741 / US | [2012/32] |
Former [2003/39] | For all designated states Bayer Corporation 100 Bayer Road Pittsburgh, PA 15205-9741 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROESLER, Richard, R. 863 Hillcrest Circle Wexford, PA 15090 / US | 02 /
HERGENROTHER, P., Richard 5072 Cashlie Court Gibsonia, PA 15044 / US | [2003/39] | Representative(s) | Perchenek, Nils Bayer Aktiengesellschaft/Bayer Polymers Law & Patents/Patents & Licensing 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [2012/32] |
Former [2008/37] | Perchenek, Nils Bayer Aktiengesellschaft/Bayer Polymers Law & Patents/Patents & Licensing 51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [2003/39] | Perchenek, Nils, Dr. Bayer Aktiengesellschaft, Bayer Polymers, Legal & Patents, Patents and Licensing 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 01996215.8 | 12.12.2001 | [2003/39] | WO2001US47802 | Priority number, date | US20000747471 | 22.12.2000 Original published format: US 747471 | [2003/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02051954 | Date: | 04.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1346001 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1346001 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C09D175/08, C08G18/28, C08G18/12 | [2003/39] | CPC: |
C09D175/08 (EP,US);
C08G18/0885 (EP,US);
C08G18/12 (EP,US);
C08G18/3893 (EP,US);
C08G18/409 (EP,US);
C08G18/482 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08G18/12, C08G18/667 (US,EP);
C08G18/12, C08G18/7664 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/39] | Title | German: | SILAN-HAFTVERMITTLER ENTHALTENDE ZWEIKOMPONENTEN-BESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2003/39] | English: | TWO-COMPONENT COATING COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING SILANE ADHESION PROMOTERS | [2003/39] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE REVETEMENT A DEUX COMPOSANTS RENFERMANT DES PROMOTEURS D'ADHESION A BASE DE SILANE | [2003/39] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/39] | 22.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 05.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.12.2008 | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/29] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 05.08.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 05.08.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.08.2012 | CY | 08.08.2012 | DK | 08.08.2012 | FI | 08.08.2012 | TR | 08.08.2012 | GR | 09.11.2012 | IE | 12.12.2012 | LU | 12.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
TR | 08.08.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IE | 12.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IE | 12.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 08.08.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0872499 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1-20 * page 2, line 56 - page 3, line 1 * * page 4, lines 19-23 * * page 12, lines 43-45 * * examples 1,4,7.8 *; | [AD]EP0864575 (BAYER AG [US]) [AD] 1-20 * claims 1-13 *; | [A]EP0949308 (BAYER AG [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * claims 1-14 *; | [A]EP0913402 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-20 * claims 1-12 * |