EP1335890 - GAS GENERATION VIA METAL COMPLEXES OF GUANYLUREA NITRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.09.2005 [2005/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Autoliv ASP, Inc. 3350 Airport Road Ogden, Utah 84405 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/34] | For all designated states AUTOLIV ASP, INC. 3350 Airport Road Ogden, Utah 84405 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MENDENHALL, Ivan, V. 643 East Center Street Providence, UT 84332 / US | [2003/34] | Representative(s) | Bankes, Stephen Charles Digby, et al Baron Warren Redfern 1000 Great West Road Brentford TW8 9DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/34] | Bankes, Stephen Charles Digby, et al BARON & WARREN 19 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 01996521.9 | 15.11.2001 | [2003/34] | WO2001US44984 | Priority number, date | US20000715780 | 17.11.2000 Original published format: US 715780 | [2003/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0240430 | Date: | 23.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1335890 | Date: | 20.08.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1335890 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C06D5/06, C06B41/00 | [2003/34] | CPC: |
C06B41/00 (EP,US);
C06B25/34 (EP,US);
C07F1/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2004/40] |
Former [2003/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GASERZEUGUNG MIT METALLKOMPLEXEN VON GUANYLHARNSTOFFNITRAT | [2003/34] | English: | GAS GENERATION VIA METAL COMPLEXES OF GUANYLUREA NITRATE | [2003/34] | French: | GENERATION DE GAZ PAR DES COMPLEXES METALLIQUES DE NITRATE DE GUANYLE UREE | [2003/34] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.05.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/34] | 15.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR360787 (DINAMITE NOBEL SA [IT]) [A] 1,12,13,23 * page 4, line 50 - line 75 *; | [A]FR919287 (ICI LTD) [A] 1,12,13,23 * page 4, line 22 - line 55 *; | [A]DE19531288 (TEMIC BAYERN CHEM AIRBAG GMBH [DE]) [A] 11 * claim - *; | [A] - BEGLEY, MICHAEL J. ET AL, "Coordination chemistry of guanidine derivatives. Part 2. Crystal and molecular structures of bis(1-carbamoylguanidine)dinitratocopper(II)", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 105:70458 CA, URL: STN, XP002200330 [A] 1,12,13,23 * abstract * | [ ] - J. CHEM. RES., SYNOP. (1986), (4), 120-1 |