EP1345891 - GLUCAGON ANTAGONIST/INVERSE AGONIST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.12.2005 [2005/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOVO NORDISK A/S Corporate Patents Novo Allé 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2003/39] | For all designated states Novo Nordisk A/S Corporate Patents, Novo Allé 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JORGENSEN, Anker, Steen Oliemollegade 8, 4., lejl. 4 DK-2100 Copenhagen / DK | 02 /
MADSEN, Peter Ulvebjerg 7 DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [2003/39] | Application number, filing date | 01996529.2 | 15.11.2001 | [2003/39] | WO2001DK00760 | Priority number, date | DK20000001733 | 17.11.2000 Original published format: DK 200001733 | [2003/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0240446 | Date: | 23.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1345891 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07C275/28, C07C275/34, C07C275/32, C07C275/40, C07D319/08, C07D319/20, C07D209/48, C07D271/06, C07D333/36, C07D257/04, A61K31/197, A61K31/41, A61P3/10, A61P3/04 | [2003/39] | CPC: |
C07D209/48 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07C275/28 (EP);
C07C275/30 (EP);
C07C275/34 (EP);
C07C275/36 (EP);
C07C275/42 (EP);
C07C311/47 (EP);
C07C317/42 (EP);
C07C323/44 (EP);
C07D257/04 (EP);
C07D271/06 (EP);
C07D319/08 (EP);
C07D319/20 (EP);
C07D333/36 (EP);
C07C2601/14 (EP);
C07C2601/16 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 17.06.2003 | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | 17.06.2003 | SI | 17.06.2003 | Title | German: | GLUCAGON-ANTAGONIST/INVERSER AGONIST | [2003/39] | English: | GLUCAGON ANTAGONIST/INVERSE AGONIST | [2003/39] | French: | ANTAGONISTES/AGONISTES INVERSES DU GLUCAGON | [2003/39] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/39] | 23.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/50] | 12.07.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PX]WO0069810 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [PX] 1-47 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0039088 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-47 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9901423 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-47 * the whole document * |